Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3366720

EP3366720 - RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/35]
Inventor(s)01 / YABE Yudai
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/35]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/35]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16857586.821.10.2016
[2018/35]
WO2016JP81361
Priority number, dateJP2015020819722.10.2015         Original published format: JP 2015208197
[2018/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017069273
Date:27.04.2017
Language:JA
[2017/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3366720
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.04.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08L7/00, C08K5/103, C08K5/42, C08L71/02, C08L101/00, C08K5/20, B60C1/00, B29B7/90, B29B7/28
[2019/45]
Former International [2018/35]C08L9/00, B29B7/28, B29B7/90, B60C1/00, C08K5/103, C08K5/20, C08K5/42, C08L71/02, C08L101/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
TitleGerman:KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER REIFEN[2018/35]
English:RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE OBTAINED THEREFROM[2018/35]
French:COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEU OBTENU À L'AIDE DE CETTE DERNIÈRE[2018/35]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2018Translation filed 
11.05.2018National basic fee paid 
11.05.2018Search fee paid 
11.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/35]
11.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2006083264  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0013] * * example - * * claim - *;
 [A]EP2799481  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[XA]JP2013056992  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1, 2, 6, 7 * , claims; paragraphs [0007], [0025], [0029]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 3-5;
 [XYA]JP2002275311  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0005], [0008], [0050], [0058], [0061], [0062]; examples * [Y] 1-3, 5-7 [A] 4;
 [XA]WO2014119671  (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [X] 1, 3 * , claims; paragraphs [0023] to [0024], [0031], [0034], [0038] to [0041]; examples & US 2015/0369335 A1 & EP 2952779 A1 claims; paragraphs [0023] to [0024], [0031], [0034], [0038] to [0041]; examples & CN 105102856 A * [A] 2, 4-7;
 [XA]JPH09249771  (UBE INDUSTRIES) [X] 1, 3, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0008], [0012]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 4, 5, 7;
 [YA]JP2000191829  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-3, 5-7 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0003] to [0004], [0008], [0010]; examples & EP 940435 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001], [0024], [0032] to [0033]; examples 1 to 14 * [A] 4;
 [YA]JP2014210829  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 1-3, 5-7 * , claims; paragraphs [0019] to [0021]; example 1 (Family: none) * [A] 4