Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3366215

EP3366215 - X-RAY DETECTOR AND SYSTEM FOR SENSING BENDING OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rayence Co., Ltd.
14 Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co., Ltd.
(Seoku-dong)
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
[2018/35]
Inventor(s)01 / JEON, Yu Sung
(Seoku-dong) 14
Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
 [2018/35]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/35]
Application number, filing date16857772.419.10.2016
[2018/35]
WO2016KR11758
Priority number, dateKR2015014527719.10.2015         Original published format: KR 20150145277
KR2015014527819.10.2015         Original published format: KR 20150145278
[2018/35]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017069514
Date:27.04.2017
Language:KO
[2017/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3366215
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.04.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00, A61B6/10, A61B6/14, G01T1/20
[2019/27]
Former International [2018/35]A61B6/00, A61B6/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
TitleGerman:RÖNTGENDETEKTOR UND SYSTEM ZUR BIEGEMESSUNG DESSELBEN[2018/35]
English:X-RAY DETECTOR AND SYSTEM FOR SENSING BENDING OF SAME[2018/35]
French:DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONS X ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTECTER LA FLEXION DE CE DÉTECTEUR[2018/35]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2018Translation filed 
09.05.2018National basic fee paid 
09.05.2018Search fee paid 
09.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2003031296  (HOHEISEL MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11,12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0036]; figure - * [A] 3,5,10 [I] 8,9;
 [XA]WO2013001917  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,11,12 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0090]; figure - * [A] 3,5,7,10;
 [X]JP2010085265  (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0036]; figure - *;
 [A]US2013028499  (TSUJII OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figure - *
International search[XY]JP2010085121  (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1, 3, 4 * See paragraphs [15]-[19] and figures 2-4. * [Y] 2, 5-12;
 [Y]JPH05192359  (TOKYO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK, et al) [Y] 2 * See paragraphs [06], [07], claim 1 and figures 1(Yi)-2(Ro) *;
 [Y]KR20100081570  (VATECH EWOO HOLDINGS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5, 11, 12 * See paragraph [43], claim 2 and figures 10a-10c. *;
 [Y]JP2002219126  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 6 * See paragraph [07] and figure 1. *;
 [Y]JP2008036205  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [Y] 7-12 * See paragraphs [14]-[18], [27], [38] and figures 1, 2. *;
 [Y]KR960016401  (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [Y] 8, 9 * See claim 2 and figures 1, 2. *