blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3365559

EP3365559 - PRIME MOVER SYSTEM AND METHODS UTILIZING BALANCED FLOW WITHIN BI-DIRECTIONAL POWER UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2023New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AOI (Advanced Oilfield Innovations, Dba A.O. International II, Inc.)
12503 Exchange Drive
Suite 150
Stafford, TX 77477 / US
[2018/35]
Inventor(s)01 / LERNER, Daniel Maurice
4346 King Cotton Lane
Missouri City, TX 77459 / US
02 / ORBAN, Andre
631 Chevy Chase Circle
Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US
03 / SINGH, Ranjit
3700 Gramercy Street
Houston, TX 77025 / US
 [2018/35]
Representative(s)Hellmich, Wolfgang
European Patent and Trademark Attorney
Lortzingstrasse 9 / 2. Stock
81241 München / DE
[2018/35]
Application number, filing date16858344.121.10.2016
[2018/35]
WO2016US58217
Priority number, dateUS201562245510P23.10.2015         Original published format: US 201562245510 P
[2018/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017070539
Date:27.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3365559
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU27.04.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:F15B7/00, F15B1/26, F16H39/02, F04B17/00
[2019/26]
CPC:
F15B7/006 (EP,US); F15B7/10 (US); F03C1/06 (US);
F04B1/12 (US); F04B23/021 (US); F04B27/1804 (US);
F04B49/22 (US); F15B1/26 (US); F15B15/17 (US);
F15B19/005 (US); F15B1/265 (EP,US); F15B2211/20538 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20561 (EP,US); F15B2211/27 (EP,US); F15B2211/30505 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3052 (EP,US); F15B2211/7052 (EP,US); F15B2211/7053 (EP,US);
F15B2211/785 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/35]F15B11/00, F15B1/02, F16H39/02, F04B17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
TitleGerman:ANTRIEBSAGGREGATSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT AUSGEGLICHENEM FLUSS IN BIDIREKTIONALEN TRIEBWERKEN[2018/35]
English:PRIME MOVER SYSTEM AND METHODS UTILIZING BALANCED FLOW WITHIN BI-DIRECTIONAL POWER UNITS[2018/35]
French:SYSTÈME DE MOTEUR D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISANT UN ÉCOULEMENT ÉQUILIBRÉ DANS DES UNITÉS DE PUISSANCE BIDIRECTIONNELLES[2018/35]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2018National basic fee paid 
22.05.2018Search fee paid 
22.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/35]
22.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.202106   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2022
31.10.202207   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2023
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5638679  (RICHARDS PAUL D [US]) [X] 1-6,9,11,15 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 10; figure 5 *;
 [X]US2008022672  (HE XINHUA [US]) [X] 1-7,11,12,15 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0080]; figures 10, 11a, 11b *;
 [XI]WO2012122159  (MOOG INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11,12,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figures 2,8, 7 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figures 9, 10 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figure 2 * [I] 7;
 [XI]WO2013112109  (DEMIRER TEKNOLOJIK SISTEMLER SANAYI VE TICARET LTD SIRKETI [TR], et al) [X] 1-7,15 * figures 1-2 * [I] 10,13,14;
 [A]EP2857696  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *
International search[Y]SU1141215  (MAKEEV ALEKSANDR M [SU], et al) [Y] 29* , abstract, fig. 2, col. 3, 4 *;
 [XY]RU2108507  (TULAMASHZAVOD AK) [X] 1-5, 7-11, 13-15, 19- 27 * , fig. 1-5, p. 6, line 24-p. 10, line 14 * [Y] 6, 12, 16-18, 28, 29;
 [Y]US5819574  (YOGO TORUAKI [JP]) [Y] 17 * , abstract, fig. 1, 4, col. 3, line 41-col. 4, line 32, col. 6, lines 49-52 *;
 [Y]RU2128789  (JA, et al) [Y] 12, 18 * , p. 6, line 26-p. 7, line 19, p. 8, lines 25-27 *;
 [Y]RU2416742  (G OBRAZOVATEL NOE UCHREZHDENIE VYSSHEGO PROFESSIONAL NOGO OBRAZOVANIJA JUZHNO ROSSIJSKIJ GTU NOVOCHE [RU]) [Y] 6, 16 * , drawing, p. 10, line 49-p. 11, lines 1-15, 37-45, p. 12, lines 10-46 *;
 [Y]CN104121142  (UNIV JIANGSU) [Y] 28 * , abstract, fig. 1-3 *
by applicantUS5638679
 US2008022672
 WO2012122159
 WO2013112109
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.