Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3369590

EP3369590 - PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR MOTORCYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/36]
Inventor(s)01 / TOKITOH Yasufumi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI Junichi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
03 / ITOI, Dyta
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
04 / NAKAMURA Takamitsu
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/36]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/36]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16859997.528.10.2016
[2018/36]
WO2016JP82170
Priority number, dateJP2015021274629.10.2015         Original published format: JP 2015212746
JP2015022521917.11.2015         Original published format: JP 2015225219
JP2015022522117.11.2015         Original published format: JP 2015225221
JP2015022522317.11.2015         Original published format: JP 2015225223
[2018/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017073769
Date:04.05.2017
Language:JA
[2017/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3369590
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.05.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/03
[2018/49]
Former International [2018/36]B60C11/01, B60C11/03, B60C11/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/36]
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN FÜR MOTORRÄDER[2018/36]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR MOTORCYCLES[2018/36]
French:PNEU POUR MOTOCYCLETTES[2018/36]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2018Translation filed 
29.05.2018National basic fee paid 
29.05.2018Search fee paid 
29.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/36]
29.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[IA]WO2009153822  (PIRELLI [IT]; MARIANI MARIO [IT]; MISANI PIERANGELO [IT]; SCHIAVOLIN A) [I] 1-3 * page 16, line 14 - line 20; figure 2; claims 12, 13, 14 * [A] 4-10
 [I]EP2626220  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0026] , [ 0052]; figure 2 *
 [XP]EP3050721  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]; SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [XP] 1,2 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [ 0062] - [0066]; figures 2, 3, 4a, 4b *
 [A]JP2013180664  (Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd.) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0044], [0054] to [0055]; fig. 1 & US 2013/0228256 A1 paragraphs [0038], [0048] to [0049]; fig. 1 & EP 2634014 A1 & KR 10-2013-0100695 A & CN 103287216 A *
 [A]JP2014131899  (Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd.) [A] 1-10 * , paragraph [0047]; fig. 1 & US 2014/0190607 A1 paragraph [0080]; fig. 1 & EP 2752310 A1 & CN 103909786 A & TW 201427846 A *
 [A]JP2009220781  (Bridgestone Corp.) [A] 1-10 * , fig. 2; examples (Family: none) *
 [A]JP2013519560  (Compagnie Generale des Etablissements Michelin) [A] 1-10 * , fig. 1 to 4 & US 2013/0186534 A1 fig. 1 to 4 & WO 2011/098401 A1 & EP 2533988 A1 *