blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3371273

EP3371273 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING TEMPERATURE STABLE CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.01.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2022New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
14.01.2022Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.02.2022  [2022/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cargill, Incorporated
15407 McGinty Road West
Mail Stop 24
Wayzata, Minnesota 55391 / US
[2018/37]
Inventor(s)01 / KOEFOD, Robert Scott
9864 Hemlock Way
Maple Grove, Minnesota 55369 / US
02 / HENSLEY, Anthony Quinn
708 Wisely Way
Ringgold, Georgia 30736 / US
 [2018/37]
Representative(s)Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Straße 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/37]Dottridge, Cass A.C.
Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA
Bedrijvenlaan 9
2800 Mechelen / BE
Application number, filing date16862971.503.11.2016
[2018/37]
WO2016US60337
Priority number, dateUS201562250195P03.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562250195 P
[2018/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017079440
Date:11.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3371273
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.05.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:G05D21/02, C09K8/88, C09K8/12, C09K3/18, B01F15/00, B01F15/04, B01F1/00, B01F3/08, C01D3/04
[2019/23]
CPC:
G05D21/02 (EP,KR,US); B01F35/2202 (EP,KR,US); B01F35/2132 (EP,KR,US);
B01F21/30 (US); B01F23/49 (US); B01F35/2215 (US);
B01F35/522 (US); B01F35/80 (RU); B01F35/82 (US);
C01D3/04 (US); G05D11/16 (RU); B01F2101/2204 (US);
C09K3/18 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/37]C09K8/88, C09K8/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/37]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TEMPERATURSTABILEN CHEMISCHEN LÖSUNGEN[2018/37]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING TEMPERATURE STABLE CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS[2018/37]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SOLUTIONS CHIMIQUES THERMOSTABLES[2018/37]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2018National basic fee paid 
02.05.2018Search fee paid 
02.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/37]
02.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2022Application withdrawn by applicant  [2022/07]
12.01.2022Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2022
01.02.2022Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.202106   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009092001  (HILDRETH CLAY [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0048] - [0053] - [ 0088] - [0099] - [ 0126] - [0131]; figure 14 *;
 [A]  - Wilfrid A Nixon ET AL, "Economics of Using Calcium Chloride vs. Sodium Chloride for Deicing/Anti-Icing Final Report TR488 By", (20080228), URL: http://publications.iowa.gov/20047/1/IADOT_tr_488_Economics_Calcium_Chloride_Sodium_Chloride_Deicing_Anti_Icing_2008.pdf, (20190416), XP055581617 [A] 1-13 * figure 2.1; table 4.1 *
 [X]  - BENSON J D ET AL, "Melting point equations for the ternary system water/sodium chloride/ethylene glycol revisited", CRYOBIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, US, vol. 61, no. 3, ISSN 0011-2240, (20101201), pages 352 - 356, (20101016), XP027533233 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * formula 10;; figure 2 *
International search[A]US2012269026  (HILDRETH CLAY [US]) [A] 1-13 * para [0007], [0032]-[0033], [0045]-[0047], [0078], [0080]-[0081] *;
 [A]US2011083965  (REID JONATHAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * para [0077], [0084], [0086] *;
 [A]US2008001118  (ALVERSON FREDERICK C [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * para [0008], [0045], [0048], [0074]; example 1 *;
 [A]WO0146334  (FOSTER MILLER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document *;
 [A]US2015252239  (MCCONNELL ALISTAIR [GB]) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document *;
 [A]US4676919  (ZIENTEK EUGENE A [US]) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document *;
 [A]US7270767  (WESTMARK CAROLYN S [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document *;
 [A]US2007278446  (KOEFOD ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1-13 * ; the entire document A *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.