Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3374659

EP3374659 - DISC BRAKE AND SET OF BRAKE PADS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
18.01.2019Change - extension statespublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[2018/38]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOENAUER, Manfred
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
02 / PAHLE, Wolfgang
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
03 / BARTEL, Markus
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
04 / FISCHL, Tobias
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
05 / BAUMGARTNER, Johann
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 4035 / US
06 / PETSCHKE, Andreas
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
07 / LANTZ, Richard L.
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
08 / TEKESKY, Robert S.
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
09 / BOHMANN, Markus
c/o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
 [2018/38]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/38]
Application number, filing date16864907.709.11.2016
[2018/38]
WO2016US61124
Priority number, dateUS20151493974812.11.2015         Original published format: US201514939748
[2018/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017083377
Date:18.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3374659
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/097, F16D55/225, F16D55/226, F16D55/2265, F16D55/227, F16D65/092
[2018/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/38]
TitleGerman:SCHEIBENBREMSE UND SATZ AUS BREMSBELÄGEN[2018/38]
English:DISC BRAKE AND SET OF BRAKE PADS[2018/38]
French:FREIN À DISQUE ET JEU DE PLAQUETTES DE FREIN[2018/38]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2018National basic fee paid 
12.06.2018Search fee paid 
12.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/38]
12.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4699255  (CLAVERIE) [Y] 1, 2, 15-28, 30-32 * entire document *
 [Y]US2006054425  (MAEHARA) [Y] 1, 2, 15-28, 30-32 * entire document *
 [Y]US5947234  (SHIMAZAKI) [Y] 16, 21, 28, 31, 32 * entire document *
 [Y]US5875873  (KAY et al) [Y] 20, 21 * entire document *
 [Y]US2009211857  (CAMILO-MARTINEZ et al) [Y] 26 * entire document *
 [A]US4214649  (FUJIMORI et al) [A] 1-32 * entire document *
 [A]WO0133096  (FEDERAL-MOGUL BRAKE SYSTEMS LIMITED) [A] 1-32 * entire document *
 [A]US2007240946  (SCHORN et al) [A] 1-32 * entire document *