blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3374659 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3374659



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 180
30.08.2019 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
25.06.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.08.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.07.2018 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
12.06.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.05.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
23.03.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.06.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 71
18.05.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 55