Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3377538

EP3377538 - FUNCTIONAL INITIATOR FOR ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/39]
Inventor(s)01 / YAN, Yuan-Yong
Bridgestone Americas
Center for Research and Technology
1655 South Main Street
Akron, Ohio 44301 / US
02 / ROGGEMAN, David M.
Firestone Polymers
381 West Wilbeth Road
Akron, Ohio 44301 / US
 [2018/39]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/39]BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date16866809.308.10.2016
[2018/39]
WO2016US56200
Priority number, dateUS201562255612P16.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562255612 P
[2018/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017087087
Date:26.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3377538
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.05.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:C08F236/10, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, B60C1/00, C08K5/36, C08K5/49, C08K5/54, C08K3/04, C08K3/06, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/50, C08K5/57, C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08L91/00, C08L91/06
[2019/30]
Former International [2018/39]C08F2/60, C08F2/44, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, B60C1/00, C08K5/36, C08K5/49, C08K5/54, C08F279/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONELLER INITIATOR FÜR ANIONISCHE POLYMERISATION[2018/39]
English:FUNCTIONAL INITIATOR FOR ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION[2018/39]
French:INITIATEUR FONCTIONNEL DE POLYMÉRISATION ANIONIQUE[2018/39]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2018National basic fee paid 
15.06.2018Search fee paid 
15.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
15.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2012091753  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,13-15 * page 36; table 2 * * page 46; example 33 * * claim 6 * [A] 9,10,12 [I] 11;
 [XP]WO2016108715  (PUBLIC JOINT STOCK COMPANY SIBUR HOLDING [RU]) [XP] 1-8,11,13-15 * page 18 - page 19; example 4 *
 [X]  - YASUO HORIKAWA ET AL, "Triallylstannyllithium-allyllithium as an initiator for the anionic reversible chain transfer polymerization of 1,3-butadiene", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, US, (19960501), vol. 34, no. 7, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1099-0518(199605)34:7<1183::AID-POLA3>3.0.CO;2-4, ISSN 0887-624X, pages 1183 - 1188, XP055596822 [X] 1-4,13 * scheme 5; page 1188 * * experimental; page 1184 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-0518(199605)34:7<1183::AID-POLA3>3.0.CO;2-4
International search[A]US2010210760  (KITAGAWA, YUICHI et al.) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0049]; and claim 1. *
 [A]US6150487  (ZHANG, XINGYING et al.) [A] 1-20 * See column 6, line 50 - column 9, line 11; and claims 1-6. *
 [A]US2013267646  (THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0043]; and claim 1. *
 [A]US2012136128  (YAN, YUAN-YONG et al.) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0053]; and claims 1-3. *
 [A]US2015031791  (THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0024]; and claim 1. *
 [PA]  - BLAIR, V. L. et al., "The importance of the Lewis base in lithium mediated metallation and bond cleavage reaction of allyl amines and allyl phosphines", Chem. Commun., (20160000), vol. 52, pages 8111 - 8114, XP055383795 [PA] 1-20 * See abstract; Schemes 1 and 2. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6CC03947B