blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3381553

EP3381553 - CATALYST, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE ANTI-1,2-NITROALKANOL COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ, ES, RO, SK
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23, Kamiosaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
[2018/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIBASAKI, Masakatsu
c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
02 / KUMAGAI, Naoya
c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
03 / NONOYAMA, Akihito
c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
04 / HASHIMOTO, Kazuki
c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
05 / SAITO, Akira
c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
 [2018/40]
Representative(s)Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
[2018/40]
Application number, filing date16868516.221.11.2016
[2018/40]
WO2016JP84515
Priority number, dateJP2015022912724.11.2015         Original published format: JP 2015229127
[2018/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017090569
Date:01.06.2017
Language:JA
[2017/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3381553
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3381553
Date:26.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:B01J31/22, B01J37/04, C07C201/12, C07C205/16, C07C205/32, C07C205/54, C07B61/00, C07C237/04, C07C237/22, C07F7/00
[2019/25]
CPC:
C07C237/22 (EP,US); B01J31/22 (US); B01J37/04 (EP,US);
C07C201/12 (EP,US); C07C205/16 (EP,US); C07C205/32 (EP,US);
C07C205/54 (EP,US); C07C237/04 (EP,US); C07F7/003 (EP,US);
B01J2231/341 (US); B01J2531/004 (US); B01J2531/12 (US);
B01J2531/38 (US); C07B61/00 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/40]B01J31/22, B01J37/04, C07C201/12, C07C205/16, C07C205/32, C07C205/54, C07B61/00, C07C237/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCH AKTIVEN ANTI-1,2-NITROALKANOL-VERBINDUNG[2018/40]
English:CATALYST, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE ANTI-1,2-NITROALKANOL COMPOUND[2018/40]
French:CATALYSEUR, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ ANTI-1,2-NITROALKANOL OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF[2018/40]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2018Translation filed 
04.06.2018National basic fee paid 
04.06.2018Search fee paid 
04.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/40]
04.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
11.05.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
08.12.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.06.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2023Fee for grant paid
14.06.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ26.07.2023
ES26.07.2023
HR26.07.2023
PL26.07.2023
RO26.07.2023
RS26.07.2023
SK26.07.2023
SM26.07.2023
NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
[2024/23]
Former [2024/20]HR26.07.2023
PL26.07.2023
RS26.07.2023
SM26.07.2023
NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
Former [2024/10]HR26.07.2023
PL26.07.2023
RS26.07.2023
NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
Former [2024/09]NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
Former [2024/08]NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2010084772  (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * compound 4 page 17, example 3 page 22 *;
 [X]WO2010126008  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 12 *;
 [X]  - NITABARU, TATSUYA; NOJIRI, AKIHIRO; KOBAYASHI, MAKOTO; KUMAGAI, NAOYA; SHIBASAKI, MASAKATSU, "anti-Selective Catalytic Asymmetric Nitroaldol Reaction via a Heterobimetallic Heterogeneous Catalyst", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20090909), vol. 131, no. 38, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 13860 - 13869, XP002791053 [X] 1-7 * ligand 7 chart 1 page 13864 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja905885z
 [X]  - TAKANORI OGAWA ET AL, "Self-Assembling Neodymium/Sodium Heterobimetallic Asymmetric Catalyst Confined in a Carbon Nanotube Network", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (20130610), vol. 52, no. 24, doi:10.1002/anie.201302236, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 6196 - 6201, XP055234781 [X] 1-7 * page 6197 right paragraph, figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201302236
 [X]  - DEVARAJULU SURESHKUMAR ET AL, "A Modified Preparation Procedure for Carbon Nanotube-Confined Nd/Na Heterobimetallic Catalyst for anti -Selective Catalytic Asymmetric Nitroaldol Reactions", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, US, (20131115), vol. 78, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jo402042s, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 11494 - 11500, XP055234783 [X] 1-7 * page 11495 scheme 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo402042s
International search[A]JPS61238764  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [A] 1-7* , claim 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009114071  (UNIV TOKYO) [A] 1-7 * , claims 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [XA]WO2010084772  (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * , claims 1 to 11; paragraphs [0032], [0043] & JP 2010-189374 A claims 1 to 11; paragraphs [0032], [0043] * [A] 4-7;
 [A]WO2015166827  (MICROBIAL CHEM RES FOUND [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , claims 1 to 9; paragraphs [0069] to [0084] & TW 201540694 A *
by applicantJP2010189374
 JP2014151313
    - CAMERON J. SMITH et al., J. Med. Chem., (20110000), vol. 54, pages 4880 - 4895
    - URAGUCHI, D. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20070000), vol. 129, page 12392
    - TAKANORI OGAWA; NAOYA KUMAGAI; MASAKATSU SHIBASAKI, Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20130000), vol. 52, pages 6196 - 6201
    - DEVARAJULU SURESHKUMAR; KAZUKI HASHIMOTO; NAOYA KUMAGAI; MASAKATSU SHIBASAKI, J. Org. Chem., (20130000), vol. 78, pages 11494 - 11500
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.