Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3385405

EP3385405 - CHROMIUM-FREE SURFACE-TREATED TINPLATE, PRODUCTION METHOD AND SURFACE TREATING AGENT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baoshan Iron & Steel Co., Ltd.
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Peng
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
02 / YAN, Renyun
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
03 / WEI, Junsheng
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
04 / LI, Binghu
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2018/41]
Application number, filing date16869958.529.11.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016CN107673
Priority number, dateCN20151085428330.11.2015         Original published format: CN201510854283
[2018/41]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017092648
Date:08.06.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3385405
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:C23C22/40
[2018/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
TitleGerman:CHROMFREIE OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTE ZINNPLATTE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL DAFÜR[2018/41]
English:CHROMIUM-FREE SURFACE-TREATED TINPLATE, PRODUCTION METHOD AND SURFACE TREATING AGENT THEREFOR[2018/41]
French:FER BLANC TRAITÉ EN SURFACE SANS CHROME, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET AGENT DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ASSOCIÉ[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2018Translation filed 
16.05.2018National basic fee paid 
16.05.2018Search fee paid 
16.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
16.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]CN103805977  (SHANGHAI FENGYE CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1484174  (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * page 5, paragraphs 28-38 * * page 8, paragraph 69 *;
 [A]EP2458031  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-17 * page 7, paragraph 39 - page 8, paragraph 44 * * page 13, paragraph 72 * * page 14, paragraph 75 * * page 18; examples 8,11; table 1 * * page 20; examples 8,11; table 2 * * page 21; examples 8,11; table 3 * * page 22; examples 8,11; table 3 *