Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3385764

EP3385764 - FERRULE EQUIPPED WITH OPTICAL FIBER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FERRULE EQUIPPED WITH OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujikura Ltd.
5-1, Kiba 1-chome
Koto-ku
Tokyo 135-8512 / JP
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAMA, Akihiro
c/o FUJIKURA LTD.
Sakura Plant
1440 Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Shigeo
c/o FUJIKURA LTD.
Sakura Plant
1440 Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Keenway Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis
PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date16870846.905.12.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016JP86030
Priority number, dateJP2015023721504.12.2015         Original published format: JP 2015237215
[2018/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017094912
Date:08.06.2017
Language:JA
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3385764
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/36, G02B6/38, G02B6/42
[2019/31]
Former International [2018/41]G02B6/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
TitleGerman:FERRULE MIT OPTISCHER FASER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FERRULE MIT OPTISCHER FASER[2018/41]
English:FERRULE EQUIPPED WITH OPTICAL FIBER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FERRULE EQUIPPED WITH OPTICAL FIBER[2018/41]
French:VIROLE À FIBRE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE VIROLE À FIBRE OPTIQUE[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2018Translation filed 
15.05.2018National basic fee paid 
15.05.2018Search fee paid 
15.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
15.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2015198773  (NAKAMA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10 * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0160]; figures 1,15,16 * [I] 2-4,8,9;
 [XI]US2015023636  (MORIYAMA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * [I] 3,4,9;
 [XI]US2013308910  (NISHIMURA AKITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0058] - [0099]; figures 1-4 * [I] 3-5,8
International search[XY]JP2013213949  (Fujikura Ltd.) [X] 1-2, 6-7, 9-10 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0027]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 2013/0308910 A1 paragraphs [0073] to [0100] * [Y] 3-5, 8
 [XY]JP2015022130  (Fujitsu Component Ltd.) [X] 1, 7-8, 10 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0025]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 2015/0023636 A1 paragraphs [0002] to [0031] * [Y] 2-6, 9
 [Y]JP2003248143  (The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd.) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraphs [0091] to [0093] & US 2003/0142946 A1 paragraphs [0177] to [0179] *
 [Y]US2009087150  (Benjamin et al.) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraph [0049] & WO 2009/045339 A1 *
 [Y]JP2007178786  (Photonic Science Technology, Inc., Hokkaido Ferrule Kabushiki Kaisha) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraph [0058] (Family: none *
 [Y]JP2012013805  (Fujikura Ltd.) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0030] to [0031]; fig. 4 to 6 & US 2011/0317959 A1 paragraphs [0063] to [0064] & CN 102313938 A *
 [Y]JP2005099477  (Fujikura Ltd.) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0015]; fig. 4 to 5 (Family: none) *