blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3384643

EP3384643 - CONSTRUCTING A SELF-ORGANIZING MESH NETWORK USING 802.11AD TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.02.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2021/12]
Former [2018/41]For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HART, Michael, J.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / JAYARAMAN, Arunkumar
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
03 / SAMUEL, Rajkumar
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
04 / GELBMAN, Peter
1600 Ampthitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[2021/12]
Former [2018/41]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date16871261.014.11.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016US61797
Priority number, dateUS20151495358730.11.2015         Original published format: US201514953587
[2018/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017095613
Date:08.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3384643
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3384643
Date:24.03.2021
Language:EN
[2021/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/751, H04L12/801, H04W16/28, H04W40/24, H04W72/12, H04W84/18, H04W84/12, H04W76/10, H04L12/717
[2019/24]
CPC:
H04W16/28 (EP,US); H04W72/12 (US); H04L45/16 (US);
H04L45/72 (US); H04W40/246 (EP,US); H04W76/10 (US);
H04L45/02 (US); H04L45/42 (EP,US); H04W40/244 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US); H04W84/12 (EP,US); H04W84/18 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/41]H04L12/751, H04L12/801
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFBAU EINES SELBSTORGANISIERENDEN MESH-NETZWERKS MIT 802.11AD-TECHNOLOGIE[2018/41]
English:CONSTRUCTING A SELF-ORGANIZING MESH NETWORK USING 802.11AD TECHNOLOGY[2018/41]
French:CONSTRUCTION D'UN RÉSEAU MAILLÉ À AUTO-ORGANISATION À L'AIDE D'UNE TECHNOLOGIE 802.11AD[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2018National basic fee paid 
08.03.2018Search fee paid 
08.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
08.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2021Fee for grant paid
09.02.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.01.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.11.2016
AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CY24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
IT24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
MK24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
IE14.11.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
CH30.11.2021
FR30.11.2021
LI30.11.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU14.11.2016
AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CY24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
IT24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
IE14.11.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
CH30.11.2021
FR30.11.2021
LI30.11.2021
Former [2023/29]HU14.11.2016
AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
IT24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
IE14.11.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
CH30.11.2021
FR30.11.2021
LI30.11.2021
Former [2023/10]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
IT24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
IE14.11.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
CH30.11.2021
FR30.11.2021
LI30.11.2021
Former [2023/01]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
IE14.11.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
CH30.11.2021
FR30.11.2021
LI30.11.2021
Former [2022/48]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
IE14.11.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
CH30.11.2021
LI30.11.2021
Former [2022/37]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
CH30.11.2021
LI30.11.2021
Former [2022/34]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
LU14.11.2021
BE30.11.2021
Former [2022/33]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
MC24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
BE30.11.2021
Former [2022/23]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
Former [2022/13]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SI24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
PT26.07.2021
IS24.12.2021
Former [2022/10]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
PT26.07.2021
IS24.12.2021
Former [2022/08]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
DK24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
ES24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
Former [2022/07]AL24.03.2021
AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
Former [2021/52]AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
PL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
Former [2021/51]AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
IS24.07.2021
PT26.07.2021
Former [2021/50]AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
RO24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SK24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
PT26.07.2021
Former [2021/48]AT24.03.2021
CZ24.03.2021
EE24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
Former [2021/46]AT24.03.2021
FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LT24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
SM24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
Former [2021/43]FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
NL24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
Former [2021/38]FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
SE24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
Former [2021/37]FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
LV24.03.2021
RS24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
Former [2021/36]FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
BG24.06.2021
NO24.06.2021
GR25.06.2021
Former [2021/35]FI24.03.2021
HR24.03.2021
NO24.06.2021
Former [2021/33]FI24.03.2021
NO24.06.2021
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006215583  (CASTAGNOLI NEAL D [US]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0152] ** claim 1 *;
 [XAYI]US2009010204  (PRATT JR WALLACE A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,15 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0170] * * figures 10,13 * [A] 7-11 [Y] 4-6 [I] 2,12-14;
 [Y]WO2015134746  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0238] - paragraph [0243] *
International search[A]US2013155919  (JUNG SANGSU [KR]) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0074]-[0087], [0122]-[0134], claims 1-10 and figures 4, 5, 8, 9. *;
 [A]US2014036724  (CASTAGNOLI NEAL DANTE [US]) [A] 1-30* See abstract, claims 22-31 and figures 4-7. *;
 [Y]WO2014124024  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [Y] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0031], [0072], [0105], claims 1, 6, 7 and figure 5. *;
 [Y]US8942219  (PRATT JR WALLACE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * See column 12, lines 58-67, column 16, lines 27, 28, column 17, lines 25-29, column 35, lines 18-21, claims 1, 8-11 and figures 1, 21, 22. *;
 [A]US2015230275  (KERPEZ KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * See abstract, paragraphs [0036]-[0063] and figures 2A-2D. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.