Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3389171

EP3389171 - POWER GENERATING DEVICE AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/42]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGAYA Go
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / WAKAO Yasumichi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/42]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/42]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16872812.921.11.2016
[2018/42]
WO2016JP84508
Priority number, dateJP2015024055509.12.2015         Original published format: JP 2015240555
[2018/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017098912
Date:15.06.2017
Language:JA
[2017/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3389171
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:H02K35/02, H02K35/04, H02N1/00, H02N2/18, B60C23/04, H02K7/18
[2018/51]
Former International [2018/42]H02K35/02, H02K35/04, H02N1/00, H02N2/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/42]
TitleGerman:STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND REIFEN[2018/42]
English:POWER GENERATING DEVICE AND TIRE[2018/42]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ET PNEU[2018/42]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2018Translation filed 
05.07.2018National basic fee paid 
05.07.2018Search fee paid 
05.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/42]
05.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2015311826  (TRAUERNICHT DAVID [US]) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0045] - [0047]; figures 1,5A,5B * [Y] 4-6
 [Y]US2014055002  (NAKATSUKA HIROSHI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 4,6 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0116] , [0120] - [0127]; figures 2a-2d *
 [Y]US2012326565  (KUISMA HEIKKI [FI] ET AL) [Y] 4,6 * paragraphs [0070] , [0088] - [0095]; figures 3,4 *
 [Y]EP2203320  (PIRELLI [IT]) [Y] 4-6 * paragraphs [0065] , [0077] , [0078] , [0079]; figure 6 *
 [X]JP2012023839  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025]; figures 2,3,5 *
 [XA]JP2012023839  (Bridgestone Corp.) [X] 1-2, 4, 6-7 * , paragraphs [0014], [0019] to [0020], [0025]; fig. 2 to 5 (Family: none) * [A] 3, 5