blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3388762

EP3388762 - MOBILE LOW-TEMPERATURE WORKTABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.09.2022
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.07.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.10.2022  [2022/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JCR Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd.
3-19 Kasuga-cho
Ashiya-shi
Hyogo 659-0021 / JP
[2018/42]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJII Minoru
c/o JCR PHARMACEUTICALS CO. LTD.
1-2-3
Murotani
Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2241 / JP
 [2018/42]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2018/42]
Application number, filing date16873000.007.12.2016
[2018/42]
WO2016JP86319
Priority number, dateJP2015024154410.12.2015         Original published format: JP 2015241544
JP2016012659727.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016126597
[2018/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017099105
Date:15.06.2017
Language:JA
[2017/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3388762
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2019
ClassificationIPC:F25D3/10
[2018/42]
CPC:
B25H1/16 (EP,US); F25D3/105 (EP,CN,US); F25D3/10 (US);
B25H1/20 (EP,US); F25D11/00 (US); F25D23/065 (US);
F25D2400/38 (EP,US); F25D2700/12 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/42]
TitleGerman:MOBILER NIEDRIGTEMPERATURARBEITSTISCH[2018/42]
English:MOBILE LOW-TEMPERATURE WORKTABLE[2018/42]
French:TABLE MOBILE BASSE-TEMPÉRATURE[2018/42]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2018Translation filed 
14.06.2018National basic fee paid 
14.06.2018Search fee paid 
14.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/42]
13.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/42]
15.06.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2022/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS63261135  (MIDORI ANZEN CO LTD);
 [AD]JPH11235150  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [XI]US6205794  (BROTHERS JOHN G [US]);
 [XI]JP2001141346  (AIR LIQUIDE);
 [A]JP2010116045  (ISHIKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK)
International search[Y]JPS5810719U  (Matsushita Refrigeration Co.) [Y] 2-7, 9-12 * , specification, page 3, line 10 to page 6, line 5; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *;
 [YA]JPS6083652  (CHINO WORKS LTD, et al) [Y] 1-7, 9-13 * , page 1, lower right column, line 20 to page 2, upper left column, line 6; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 8;
 [YA]JP2000051627  (SHINEI SANGYO KK) [Y] 1-7, 9-13 * , paragraph [0005]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * [A] 8;
 [YA]US6205794  (BROTHERS JOHN G [US]) [Y] 1-7, 9-13 * , column 2, line 26 to column 4, line 5; fig. 1, 2 & WO 2001/009557 A1 * [A] 8;
 [Y]JP2010116045  (ISHIKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 10-12* , paragraphs [0001] to [0002]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [YA]JP2011047559  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-7, 9-13 * , paragraph [0030]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 8
ExaminationJPS6083652
by applicantJPH11235150
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.