Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3393064

EP3393064 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, WIRELESS NETWORK COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION RELAY DEVICE, PROGRAM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SUYAMA, Akihiko
c/o Yamaha Corporation
10-1 Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Ettmayr, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/43]
Application number, filing date16875570.012.12.2016
[2018/43]
WO2016JP86850
Priority number, dateJP2015024279614.12.2015         Original published format: JP 2015242796
[2018/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017104593
Date:22.06.2017
Language:JA
[2017/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3393064
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04B17/309, G06F3/14, H04W24/08
[2018/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSNETZWERKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSRELAISVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN[2018/43]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, WIRELESS NETWORK COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION RELAY DEVICE, PROGRAM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD[2018/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF RELAIS DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, PROGRAMME, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS[2018/43]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2018Translation filed 
13.06.2018National basic fee paid 
13.06.2018Search fee paid 
13.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
13.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007233694  (BAXTER ROBERT A [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0049] , [0074] , [0096] , [0104] , [0105] , [0108] , [0116] , [0117] * * figures 1,13 *
International search[XYA]JP2003258710  (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC) [X] 1, 6, 9, 14-16 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0024] (Family: none) * [Y] 7-8 [A] 2-5, 10-13;
 [Y]JP2009015551  (SONY CORP) [Y] 7-8 * , fig. 1 & US 2009/0011709 A1 fig. 1 *;
 [Y]JP2008098736  (SONY CORP) [Y] 7-8 * , fig. 1 & US 2008/0084823 A1 fig. 1 & CN 101159454 A *;
 [PXY]JP2016139891  (KDDI CORP) [PX] 1-6, 9-16 * , paragraphs [0024], [0063] to [0086]; fig. 2, 7, 8 (Family: none) * [PY] 7-8;
 [PA]JP2016181783  (KDDI CORP) [PA] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0044] to [0060]; fig. 5 & JP 5966040 B1 *;
 [A]JP2015206564  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-16 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2006324945  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015122604