Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3391784

EP3391784 - SEAT PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHITOMI, Kosuke
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/43]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16875582.512.12.2016
[2018/43]
WO2016JP86889
Priority number, dateJP2015024570416.12.2015         Original published format: JP 2015245704
[2018/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017104605
Date:22.06.2017
Language:JA
[2017/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3391784
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:A47C27/14, A47C7/18, C08G101/00, C08G18/48, C08G18/63, C08G18/66, C08G18/76, C08G18/18, C08G18/20, C08G18/32, C08G18/40
[2018/45]
Former International [2018/43]A47C27/14, A47C7/18, B60N2/44, C08G101/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
TitleGerman:SITZUNTERLAGE[2018/43]
English:SEAT PAD[2018/43]
French:COUSSIN DE SIÈGE[2018/43]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2018Translation filed 
11.06.2018National basic fee paid 
11.06.2018Search fee paid 
11.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
11.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010102616  (YAMASAKI KOUICHIROU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * * page 2 - page 3; example 2; tables 1,2 * * page 2, paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [Y]WO2010140304  (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * comparative example 2;; example 6; table 2 * * page 15, paragraph [0041] *
International search[Y]JP2006204887  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0065]; fig. 2, 7 & JP 2011-218227 A & US 2008/0012407 A1 paragraphs [0045] to [0060]; fig. 2, 7 & WO 2006/070625 A1 & EP 1832204 A1 & CN 101128138 A *;
 [Y]JP2013124336  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0057] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2002300936  (INOUE MTP KK, et al) [Y] 3-4 * , claims 1 to 3; fig. 5 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2001070083  (INOUE MTP KK, et al) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraph [0025]; fig. 10 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008188285  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0037]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2010/0102616 A1 paragraphs [0016] to [0041]; fig. 1 to 2 & WO 2008/096620 A1 & EP 2123195 A1 & CN 101610701 A *