Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3395993

EP3395993 - HIGH YIELD RATIO TYPE HIGH-STRENGTH COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Posco
(Goedong-dong)
6261 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
[2018/44]
Inventor(s)01 / KOO, Min-Seo
c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works
20-26
Pokposarang-gil
Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR
02 / HAN, Seong-Ho
c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works
20-26
Pokposarang-gil
Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR
 [2018/44]
Representative(s)Zech, Stefan Markus
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2018/44]
Application number, filing date16879274.519.12.2016
[2018/44]
WO2016KR14856
Priority number, dateKR2015018550223.12.2015         Original published format: KR 20150185502
[2018/44]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017111407
Date:29.06.2017
Language:KO
[2017/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3395993
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/38, C22C38/32, C22C38/28, C22C38/26, C22C38/06, C22C38/02, C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C21D6/00, C21D9/46, C22C38/04
[2019/50]
Former International [2018/44]C22C38/38, C22C38/32, C22C38/28, C22C38/26, C22C38/06, C22C38/02, C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C21D6/00, C21D9/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/44]
TitleGerman:HOCHFESTES KALTGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH MIT HOHEM STRECKGRENZENVERHÄLTNIS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2018/44]
English:HIGH YIELD RATIO TYPE HIGH-STRENGTH COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF[2018/44]
French:TÔLE D'ACIER HAUTE RÉSISTANCE LAMINÉE À FROID DE TYPE À HAUTE LIMITE D'ÉLASTICITÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2018/44]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2018Translation filed 
12.07.2018National basic fee paid 
12.07.2018Search fee paid 
12.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/44]
12.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[IA]JPH0925538  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [I] 1 * claims 1-3,6,12,13,16; tables 1-5 * [A] 2-4;
 [IA]KR20120074798  (POSCO [KR]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0051]; claims 1,3,4; tables 1,2 * [A] 2-4;
 [A]KR20140031753  (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0056]; claims 1-5; tables 1,2 *
International search[X]KR20120074798  (POSCO [KR]) [X] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0032], [0067], [00691 and claims 1, 8. *;
 [A]KR20140055463  (HYUNDAI STEEL CO [KR]) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0091]-[0095] and claims 1, 5. *;
 [A]JP2010090432  (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0046] and claims 1-7. *;
 [A]JPH10130782  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-4 * See paragraph [0025] and claims 1-3. *;
 [A]KR20100096840  (HYUNDAI STEEL CO [KR]) [A] 1-4 * See paragraph [0038] and claims 1-5. *