blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3393589

EP3393589 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR READILY REMOVING NAIL COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.11.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.01.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024Change - divisional application(s)published on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mycone Dental Supply Company, Inc.
480 South Democrat Road
Gibbstown, New Jersey 08027 / US
[2018/44]
Inventor(s)01 / CRESCIMANNO, Stephen
805 Princeton Place
Hatfield, Pennsylvania 19440 / US
02 / FISHBEIN, Paul L.
7 Heather Lane
Cherry Hill, New Jersey 08003 / US
03 / STEFFIER, Larry W.
4 Fountain Court
Cherry Hill, New Jersey 08034 / US
04 / CURRY, Serene Y.
31 Pond View Drive
Richboro, Pennsylvania 18954 / US
 [2019/21]
Former [2018/44]01 / CRESCIMANNO, Stephen
805 Princeton Place
Hatfield Pennsylvania 19440 / US
02 / FISHBEIN, Paul L.
7 Heather Lane
Cherry Hill New Jersey 08003 / US
03 / STEFFIER, Larry W.
4 Fountain Court
Cherry Hill New Jersey 08034 / US
04 / CURRY, Serene Y.
31 Pond View Drive
Richboro Pennsylvania 18954 / US
Representative(s)Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB
Steinsdorfstraße 2
80538 München / DE
[2024/07]
Former [2018/44]Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
Application number, filing date16880017.521.12.2016
[2018/44]
WO2016US67989
Priority number, dateUS20151497880622.12.2015         Original published format: US201514978806
[2018/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017112754
Date:29.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3393589
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3393589
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.06.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2019
ClassificationIPC:A61Q3/02, A61K8/00, A61K8/18, A61K8/37, A61Q3/00
[2018/44]
CPC:
A45D29/00 (EP,US); A61K8/8152 (EP,KR,US); A45D29/007 (KR,US);
A45D29/18 (EP,KR,US); A45D34/042 (KR,US); A61K8/042 (KR,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US); A61K8/8117 (EP,US); A61K8/8135 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US); A61Q3/00 (EP,US); A61Q3/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q3/04 (KR); A61K2800/87 (KR,US); A61K2800/884 (EP,US);
A61K2800/95 (KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM LEICHTEN ENTFERNEN VON NAGELLACKEN[2018/44]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR READILY REMOVING NAIL COATINGS[2018/44]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR RETIRER FACILEMENT DES VERNIS À ONGLES[2018/44]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2018National basic fee paid 
19.06.2018Search fee paid 
19.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/44]
19.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2024Fee for grant paid
08.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP24157292.4
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2012147613  (NAILS GOOW KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] - [0040] , [0041] , [0059] , [0060] , [0080]; figures 1-29j; claims 1-16 * [I] 6;
 [X]US2013263875  (BURGESS TAMARA [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] - [0043] - [0047] - [0050] - [0053] *;
 [I]US2015265524  (LI CHUNHUA [US], et al) [I] 1-3,6-15* paragraphs [0038] - [0099] *
International search[Y]US6224887  (SAMOUR CARLOS M [US], et al) [Y] 16 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2010178321  (HANATANI AKINORI [JP], et al) [Y] 9, 10, 14 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2013319441  (MA LINDA [US]) [Y] 20* entire document *;
 [XY]WO2014086862  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1, 2, 6-8, 17, 19 * entire document * [Y] 3-5, 9, 10, 13-16, 18, 20, 22, 23;
 [Y]WO2014152964  (MYCONE DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY INC [US], et al) [Y] 4, 5, 15, 22, 23 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2015313831  (LI CHUNHUA [US], et al) [Y] 3, 13, 18 * entire document *
ExaminationUS6803394
 US2006016455
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.