blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3399001

EP3399001 - AQUEOUS COATING MATERIAL COMPOSITION AND COATING FILM FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.09.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.05.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Paint Automotive Coatings Co., Ltd.
2-14-1, Shodai-Ohtani
Hirakata-shi
Osaka 573-1153 / JP
[2018/45]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIOKA, Miho
c/o NIPPON PAINT AUTOMOTIVE COATINGS CO. LTD.
2-14-1 Shodai-Ohtani
Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1153 / JP
02 / SHIMIZU, Makoto
c/o NIPPON PAINT AUTOMOTIVE COATINGS CO. LTD.
2-14-1 Shodai-Ohtani
Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1153 / JP
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[2022/41]
Former [2018/45]Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date16881778.127.12.2016
[2018/45]
WO2016JP88921
Priority number, dateJP2015025664028.12.2015         Original published format: JP 2015256640
[2018/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017115804
Date:06.07.2017
Language:JA
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3399001
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3399001
Date:12.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.07.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2019
ClassificationIPC:C09D5/02, C09D7/63, C09D7/65, B05D7/00, C09D133/02, C09D175/04, C09D133/14, B05D7/14
[2022/19]
CPC:
C09D5/02 (EP,US); B05D7/14 (EP,US); B05D7/542 (US);
C08G18/80 (US); C08K5/29 (EP,US); C09D133/02 (EP);
C09D133/08 (US); C09D133/14 (EP); C09D167/02 (US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US); C09D7/63 (EP,US); C09D7/65 (EP);
B05D2202/10 (US); B05D2203/00 (US); B05D2401/20 (EP);
B05D2502/005 (EP); B05D2503/00 (EP); B05D2505/50 (EP);
B05D3/102 (EP); B05D7/532 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/35]C09D175/04, B05D7/24, C09D5/00, C09D5/02, C09D133/02, C09D133/14, C09D7/65, C09D7/63, B05D7/00
Former IPC [2018/45]C09D175/04, B05D7/24, C09D5/00, C09D5/02, C09D7/12, C09D133/02, C09D133/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BESCHICHTUNGSFILMFORMUNGSVERFAHREN[2018/45]
English:AQUEOUS COATING MATERIAL COMPOSITION AND COATING FILM FORMING METHOD[2018/45]
French:COMPOSITION AQUEUSE DE MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FILM DE REVÊTEMENT[2018/45]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2018Translation filed 
12.07.2018National basic fee paid 
12.07.2018Search fee paid 
12.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
28.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2022Fee for grant paid
05.09.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)13.07.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.12.2016
AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CY12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
IT12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SI12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
IE27.12.2022
LU27.12.2022
BE31.12.2022
CH31.12.2022
LI31.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
[2024/26]
Former [2024/21]HU27.12.2016
AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CY12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SI12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
IE27.12.2022
LU27.12.2022
BE31.12.2022
CH31.12.2022
LI31.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2024/18]HU27.12.2016
AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SI12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
IE27.12.2022
LU27.12.2022
BE31.12.2022
CH31.12.2022
LI31.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/51]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SI12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
IE27.12.2022
LU27.12.2022
BE31.12.2022
CH31.12.2022
LI31.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/49]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
IE27.12.2022
LU27.12.2022
BE31.12.2022
CH31.12.2022
LI31.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/48]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
IE27.12.2022
LU27.12.2022
CH31.12.2022
LI31.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/47]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
LU27.12.2022
CH31.12.2022
LI31.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/38]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
LU27.12.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/37]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/35]AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/34]AT12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/33]AT12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/26]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/24]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/23]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/22]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/20]LT12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
Former [2023/17]NL12.10.2022
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2187194  (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, lines 23-50; example all; claims 1, 3, 4 *;
 [Y]JPS6359375  (SHINTO PAINT CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * examples 1,2; table 1 *;
 [A]US5834555  (MEISENBURG UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO03004575  (BASF CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0019] *;
 [Y]US2006121204  (NAKAE YASUKIHO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 9] , [0 21] - [0023] - [0 62] , [0 93] , [0 95] , [0 96] *;
 [XYI]US2009171016  (SATO KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0 14] - [0022] - [0 36] - [0039] - [0 53] - [0057] - [0 67] , [0 79] , [0084] , [ 109] , [ 123] , [ 153]; examples 5, 7, 12, 14; tables 3-6 * * paragraphs [0069] , [0 74] , [0 76] * [Y] 1-13 [I] 3,9;
 [A]US2011108426  (HAYASHI KOUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [AD]JP2013133445  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [AD] 1-13* the whole document *;
 [A]JP2015164983  (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0019] *
International search[A]JPH06192616  (KYOEISHA CHEMICAL) [A] 1-13 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH07166128  (ASAHI TSUSHO KK) [A] 1-13 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [Y]WO2005075587  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11, 13 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0009], [0021] to [0023], [0084], [0086] to [0087]; examples & US 2006/0121204 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001], [0009], [0021] to [0023], [0093], [0095] to [0096]; examples & KR 10-2007-0020214 A & CN 1918251 A *;
 [A]JP2005238222  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , claims; examples & US 2005/0161330 A1 claims; examples & KR 10-2005-0077027 A & CN 1647862 A *;
 [XY]JP2009516638  (Nippon Paint Co., Ltd.) [X] 1-11, 13 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0005], [0016], [0043] to [0045], [0059], [0062] to [0063], [0072] to [0074], [0084], [0089], [0131], [0163]; examples & US 2009/0171016 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001], [0005], [0014], [0037] to [0039], [0053], [0056] to [0057], [0067] to [0069], [0079], [0084], [0123], [0153]; examples & WO 2007/061081 A1 & KR 10-2008-0068879 A & CN 101313020 A * [Y] 1-11, 13;
 [A]JP2013060577  (BASF JAPAN LTD) [A] 1-13* , claims; examples & WO 2013/027093 A1 claims; examples & EP 2748215 A1 & CN 103608371 A *;
 [A]JP2013133445  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015000917  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO, et al) [A] 1-13 * , claims; examples & US 2015/0376390 A1 claims; examples & CN 105051078 A *;
 [A]JP2015120821  (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-13 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015164983  (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-13 * , paragraph [0019] (Family: none) *
by applicantJPS4224192B
 JPS439076B
 JPS4841718B
 JPS5541607B
 JP2011131135
 JP2013133445
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.