blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3397895

EP3397895 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ALIGNMENT OF ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.07.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.07.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2023Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.07.2023  [2023/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Signify Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 48
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2020/25]
Former [2018/45]For all designated states
Eaton Intelligent Power Limited
30 Pembroke Road
4 Dublin / IE
Inventor(s)01 / NOLAN, Christopher, D.
125 East Jefferson Street
Syracuse NY 13202 / US
02 / WITKOWSKI, Joseph, J.
125 East Jefferson Street
Syracuse NY 13202 / US
03 / CASPER, Joseph, J.
125 East Jefferson Street
Syracuse NY 13202 / US
04 / VOLLMER, Benjamin, David
125 East Jefferson Street
Syracuse NY 13202 / US
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle
Signify Netherlands B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2020/36]
Former [2018/45]Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date16882572.728.12.2016
[2018/45]
WO2016US68905
Priority number, dateUS201562271588P28.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562271588 P
[2018/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017117237
Date:06.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3397895
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3397895
Date:02.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.07.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:F21V21/14, F21V21/15, // F21S8/08, F21V21/30, F21W131/105, F21V23/04, F21Y115/10
[2019/23]
CPC:
F21V21/15 (EP,US); F21V21/14 (EP,US); G01C19/02 (US);
G01C5/00 (US); G01P15/18 (US); F21S8/08 (EP,US);
F21V21/30 (EP,US); F21V23/0442 (EP,US); F21V23/0492 (EP,US);
F21V29/507 (EP,US); F21V29/75 (EP,US); F21W2131/105 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/45]F21V14/00, H05B37/02, F21V23/04, F21Y115/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUSRICHTUNG EINER BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/45]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ALIGNMENT OF ILLUMINATION DEVICE[2018/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ALIGNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2018/45]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2018National basic fee paid 
26.07.2018Search fee paid 
26.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
25.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2020Fee for grant paid
22.07.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.06.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.12.2016
AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CY02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
MK02.09.2020
MT02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
TR02.09.2020
NL23.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
BE31.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
[2023/29]
Former [2022/34]HU28.12.2016
AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CY02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
MK02.09.2020
MT02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
TR02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
BE31.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2022/32]HU28.12.2016
AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CY02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
MK02.09.2020
MT02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
TR02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2022/27]HU28.12.2016
AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CY02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
MT02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
TR02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/52]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/47]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IE28.12.2020
LU28.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/46]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IE28.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/40]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
MC02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/37]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
DK02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/36]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SI02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/28]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SK02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/25]AL02.09.2020
AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
IS02.01.2021
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/23]AT02.09.2020
CZ02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ02.09.2020
EE02.09.2020
FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RO02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
SM02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/21]FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
PT04.01.2021
Former [2021/10]FI02.09.2020
HR02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
LV02.09.2020
PL02.09.2020
RS02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
Former [2021/09]FI02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
GR03.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
SE02.09.2020
BG02.12.2020
NO02.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI02.09.2020
LT02.09.2020
NO02.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002075691  (COUILLAUD PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,11,13,15 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2006245189  (GORDIN MYRON K [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [Y]US2012235580  (LEE KE-CHIN [CN]) [Y] 4,7,11,15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1,8,9 *;
 [A]US2013268246  (GORDIN MYRON [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YA]WO2015101647  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11,13-15;
 [XY]WO2015128143  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 9 * * page 9, line 15 - page 17, line 12 * * page 20, line 19 - page 23, line 2 * * figures 1-3,7,8 * [Y] 4,7,11,12,15;
 [XP]WO2016008746  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [XP] 1-5,7-11,13,15 * page 7, line 19 - page 13, line 7 * * page 14, line 6 - page 16, line 2 * * page 19, line 21 - page 21, line 5 * * figures 1,2,7 *
International search[A]JP2010257742  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [A] 1-18* See paragraphs 16-22, claim 1, and figures 1-2. *;
 [Y]US2011285515  (FUSHIMI SHIGEMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18 * See paragraphs 26-37, 43, 55, and figures 1-2. *;
 [Y]EP2760257  (MERIVAARA OY [FI]) [Y] 1-18 * See paragraphs 28-32, 64-68, claim 13, and figures 1A-1C. *;
 [A]JP2015082470  (KOWA CO) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs 30-42, and figures 1, 6. *;
 [A]US9198262  (BOSUA PHILIP ANTHONY [AU], et al) [A] 1-18 * See column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 58, and figure 17. *
by applicantUS2002075691
 US2014334149
 US2015167937
 WO2015128143
 WO2016008746
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.