blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3397996

EP3397996 - TWO MODE ELECTRO-OPTIC FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SureWerx USA Inc.
300 Corporate Drive
Elgin, IL 60123 / US
[2019/39]
Former [2018/45]For all designated states
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PETELIN, Andrej
Jamova 39
1000 Ljubljana / SI
02 / MUSEVIC, Igor
Jamova 39
1000 Ljubljana / SI
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2018/45]
Application number, filing date16882779.830.12.2016
[2018/45]
WO2016US69583
Priority number, dateUS201562273547P31.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562273547 P
[2018/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017117570
Date:06.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3397996
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.07.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:G02B5/30, G02F1/139, C09K19/02, G02F1/03
[2018/45]
CPC:
G02F1/13306 (EP,US); A61F9/062 (US); C09K19/0208 (EP,US);
G02B27/281 (EP,US); G02F1/133528 (US); G02F1/13363 (US);
G02F1/13471 (EP,US); G02F1/1397 (EP,US); G02F1/1323 (EP,US);
G02F1/133531 (US); G02F1/133634 (EP,US); G02F1/133635 (EP,US);
G02F1/1398 (EP,US); G02F2203/48 (EP,US); G02F2203/62 (EP,US);
G02F2413/04 (US); G02F2413/05 (US); G02F2413/06 (US);
G02F2413/14 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROOPTISCHES FILTER MIT ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN[2018/45]
English:TWO MODE ELECTRO-OPTIC FILTER[2018/45]
French:FILTRE ÉLECTRO-OPTIQUE BIMODE[2018/45]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2018National basic fee paid 
17.07.2018Search fee paid 
17.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
31.10.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
03.01.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/33]
06.02.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012002121  (PIRS JANEZ [SI], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] , [0032] - [0035] - [0048] , [0058] , [0060] , [0070] , [0092]; figures 8-10 *;
 [A]US2015001378  (MAGNUSSON KRISTINA M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[XA]US3890628  (GURTLER RICHARD W) [X] 1, 12 * See column 7, claims 1,5 and figures 6-8. * [A] 2-11, 13-19;
 [A]US2014168546  (MAGNUSSON KRISTINA M [SE], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0042], claim 16 and figures 3-4. *;
 [A]US2012002121  (PIRS JANEZ [SI], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraph [0088], claims 1-3 and figure 8. *;
 [A]US2014013479  (MAGNUSSON KRISTINA [SE], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0044]-[0047], claims 1-6 and figure 3. *;
 [A]US2010045924  (POWERS RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0046]-[0049] and figure 3. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.