Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470550

EP3470550 - ELECTRODE HEAD FOR AN ELECTROLYSIS INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lefevre, Yves
C/ Doctor Aquilino Hurlé Nº 31-33
33202 Gijón (Asturias) / ES
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Herrero & Asociados, S.L.
Cedaceros, 1
28014 Madrid / ES
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16891321.824.02.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016ES70116
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017144737
Date:31.08.2017
Language:ES
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470550
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES31.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:C25B11/02, C25C1/16
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRODENKOPF FÜR EINE ELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:ELECTRODE HEAD FOR AN ELECTROLYSIS INSTALLATION[2019/16]
French:TÊTE D'ÉLECTRODE POUR INSTALLATION D'ÉLECTROLYSE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2018Translation filed 
26.11.2018National basic fee paid 
26.11.2018Search fee paid 
26.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/16]
deletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2019/16]
26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
26.11.2018Request for further processing filed
26.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation
26.11.2018Request for further processing filed
26.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
26.11.2018Request for further processing filed
26.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
26.11.2018Request for further processing filed
26.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2019Decision despatched
26.11.2018Request for further processing filed
26.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
26.11.2018Request for further processing filed
26.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2019Decision despatched
26.11.2018Request for further processing filed
26.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
24.09.201803   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2013150163  (ZINCOBRE INGENIERIA S L U [ES], et al) [A] 1-10 * , pp. 5 and 6, figs. 3 and 4. *;
 [A]WO0163013  (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * , pp. 3 and 4. *;
 [A]WO2004042119  (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * , pp. 3 and 4. *;
 [A]WO2015107475  (HUMAN JAN PETRUS [ZA]) [A] 1-10 * , pp. 3 and 4. *