Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474585

EP3474585 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SELF-ADAPTIVE FREQUENCY ADJUSTMENT FOR USE IN INDOOR COVERAGE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co., Ltd.
No. 86, Hechang 7th West Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Development District
Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / TANG, Yanbo
No.86 Hechang 7th West Road
Zhong Kai Hi-tech Development District
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16902608.526.12.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016CN112030
Priority number, dateCN20161041829215.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610418292
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215232
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474585
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/20, H04W72/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SELBSTADAPTIVEN FREQUENZEINSTELLUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM NETZWERK MIT INNENRAUMABDECKUNG[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SELF-ADAPTIVE FREQUENCY ADJUSTMENT FOR USE IN INDOOR COVERAGE NETWORK[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE DE FRÉQUENCE AUTO-ADAPTATIF DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COUVERTURE INTÉRIEURE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2017Translation filed 
29.11.2017National basic fee paid 
29.11.2017Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04