Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465464

EP3465464 - RELEVANT PASSAGE RETRIEVAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BAI, Jing
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
02 / LIU, Yue-Sheng
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
03 / PEDERSEN, Jan O.
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / YANG, Mao
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
05 / LU, Qi
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16902637.423.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016CN82980
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017201647
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465464
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR AUFFINDUNG RELEVANTER ABSCHNITTE[2019/15]
English:RELEVANT PASSAGE RETRIEVAL SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME D'EXTRACTION DE PASSAGE PERTINENT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2018National basic fee paid 
15.10.2018Search fee paid 
15.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016015267  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO ET AL.) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]WO2009035871  (POWERSET INC) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]US2010185623  (LU YUMAO ET AL.) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *