Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467411

EP3467411 - DOOR OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE, AND REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hefei Hualing Co., Ltd.
No. 176 Jinxiu Road
Hefei Economic and Technological Development Area
Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN
For all designated states
Midea Group Co., Ltd.
B26-28F Midea Headquarter Building
No. 6 Midea Avenue
Beijiao
Shunde, Foshan
Guangdong 528311 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YAO, Jun
No. 176 Jinxiu Road
Hefei Economic And Technological
Development Area
Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN
02 / JIANG, Mingbo
No. 176 Jinxiu Road
Hefei Economic And Technological
Development Area
Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Lam, Alvin , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16902831.315.07.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016CN90229
Priority number, dateCN20161038416427.05.2016         Original published format: CN201610384164
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017201844
Date:30.11.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467411
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/02, E05F15/619, E05F1/10, E05F15/611, E05F15/63, E05F15/614
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/15]F25D23/02, E05F15/619, E05F1/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:TÜRÖFFNUNGS- UND -SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN KÜHLSCHRANK[2019/15]
English:DOOR OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE, AND REFRIGERATOR[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE ET DE FERMETURE DE PORTE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2018Translation filed 
14.11.2018National basic fee paid 
14.11.2018Search fee paid 
14.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
24.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4121382  (DIETRICH EDWARD J, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 12; figure - * [Y] 9,10;
 [X]EP1925774  (BUBENDORFF SA [FR]) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0033] - [0034] - [0 43] - [0047]; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US3141662  (WISE RALPH H) [Y] 9,10 * figure - *;
 [A]US2007152098  (SHEAHAN JAMES J JR [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0029] - [0030] - [0033] - [0034] - [0039] - [0040]; figures 3-4 *
International search[A]CN2422600Y  (KELONG ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT CO [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , description, page 3, paragraphs 4-5, and figures 6-9 *;
 [A]CN104328971  (QINGDAO HAIER CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN2426508Y  (MEILING CO LTD HEFEI [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN2443126Y  (HAIER GROEP CORP [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN205047032U  (WANLI SECURITY PRODUCT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN204081836U  (DONG KAI) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]KR20120139316  (SHINWOO FRONTIER CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]JP2016011786  (NIDEC SANKYO CORP) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *