Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467635

EP3467635 - DATA WRITING AND READING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DISTRIBUTED OBJECT STORAGE CLUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hangzhou Hikvision Digital Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CAO, Li
No. 555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16902961.809.11.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016CN105175
Priority number, dateCN20161035161525.05.2016         Original published format: CN201610351615
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017201977
Date:30.11.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467635
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DATENSCHREIB- UND -LESEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG UND VERTEILTER OBJEKTSPEICHERCLUSTER[2019/15]
English:DATA WRITING AND READING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DISTRIBUTED OBJECT STORAGE CLUSTER[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉCRITURE ET DE LECTURE DE DONNÉES, ET GRAPPE DE STOCKAGE D'OBJET DISTRIBUÉE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018Translation filed 
12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Search fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2013086317  (NAKANO TAKAHIRO [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-3, 11-13 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0046] *;
 [A]US2011225209  (VOLVOVSKI ILYA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0071] *;
 [A]US2011219106  (WRIGHT DAVID D [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5b * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0063] *;
 [A]WO2016053198  (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0042] *