Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466789

EP3466789 - DRIVING CONTROL METHOD AND DRIVING CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HIRAMATSU, Machiko
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / SUNDA, Takashi
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / NEMOTO, Hideaki
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16903175.427.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016JP65737
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203694
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466789
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60W50/10, B60W50/14, // B60W40/08, B60W50/00, B60W30/18
[2019/48]
Former International [2019/15]B60W50/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FAHRSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND FAHRSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:DRIVING CONTROL METHOD AND DRIVING CONTROL DEVICE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CONDUITE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CONDUITE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018Translation filed 
14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Search fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
25.11.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
14.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2014371981  (NORDBRUCH STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,6-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0029] - [0055] - [0062] *;
 [A]US2015166069  (ENGELMAN GERALD H [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] - [0012] - [0022] - [0031] *;
 [A]US2015066319  (JEON BYEONG WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1,3,6-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0032] , [0033] *;
 [A]EP2848484  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,6-15 * paragraph [0070] *;
 [A]US2012316699  (FILEV DIMITAR PETROV [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6-15 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE102013011538  (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] *;
 [A]JP2016052881  (DENSO CORP) [A] 10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0027] , [0028] , [0069] - [0072] *;
 [A]JP2006322752  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 13,14 * paragraph [0032] *
International search[YA]JP2016020177  (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-2, 10-11, 13, 16 * , paragraphs [0011], [0021], [0056] to [0060], [0076]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 3-9, 12, 14-15;
 [YA]JP2000231326  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG) [Y] 1-2, 10-11, 13, 16 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0021] & US 6449572 B1 column 1, line 46 to column 4, line 9 & EP 1013509 A2 & DE 19860248 C1 * [A] 3-9, 12, 14-15;
 [A]JP2001071833  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-16 * , abstract; paragraph [0007]; fig. 5 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010198120  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-16 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0014], [0036]; fig. 2 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009110184  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-16 * , claims 1 to 2; paragraph [0007]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *