Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467769

EP3467769 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rakuten, Inc.
1-14-1, Tamagawa
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 158-0094 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAE Yeongnam
c/o Rakuten Inc.
1-14-1 Tamagawa
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 158-0094 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16903186.127.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016JP65771
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203705
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467769
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM[2019/15]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2018Translation filed 
07.11.2018National basic fee paid 
07.11.2018Search fee paid 
07.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2002259969  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2002/0080998 A1 entire text; all drawings & EP 1220182 A2 *;
 [A]JP2012088796  (KDDI CORP) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005250786  (TATEYAMA MACHINE KK) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012238244  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0288150 A1 entire text; all drawings & DE 102012103860 A1 & CN 102842029 A *;
 [A]JP2014203157  (CANON KK) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]  - KOTA OHARA et al., "Jokei Gazo karano Moji Chushutsu ni Okeru Iro Bunkai Gazo no Fukugo o Mochiita Koho Gazo Seisei to Tokuchoryo Hokyo ni Kansuru Kenkyu", Dai 75 Kai (Heisei 25 Nen) Zenkoku Taikai Koen Ronbunshu(2) Jinko Chino to Ninchi Kagaku, (20130306), vol. 75, pages 447 - 448, XP009513156 [A] 1-12