Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463404

EP3463404 - COMPOSITION OF PROBIOTICS AND DIGESTIVE ENZYMES AND METHOD OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shafer, Kim
637 Napa Valley Drive
Milford, MI 48381 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16903312.324.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016US33976
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204788
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463404
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/74, A61K35/747, A61K35/745, C12N1/20
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS PROBIOTIKA UND VERDAUUNGSENZYMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/15]
English:COMPOSITION OF PROBIOTICS AND DIGESTIVE ENZYMES AND METHOD OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITION DE PROBIOTIQUES ET D'ENZYMES DIGESTIVES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Search fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
13.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]AU2015100952  (MEDLAB IP PTY LTD) [Y] 2-8, 11-23, 29-30 * ; paragraphs [0057], [0065], [0070], [0072], [0076], [0079]-[0080], [0087]-[0088], [0100] *;
 [Y]US2005281792  (SHORT JAY M [US], et al) [Y] 14, 19-23 * ; paragraphs [0033], [0357] *;
 [Y]US6368617  (HASTINGS CARL W [US], et al) [Y] 3 * ; column 4, lines 66-67; column 5, lines 1-2 *;
 [Y]US2015250835  (HUANG HUI-YU [TW], et al) [Y] 19-23, 26-30 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0039], [0048]-[0049], [0051], [0124]; table 5; claim 9 *;
 [A]US2010291050  (DAIKELER CARL D [US], et al) [A] 9-10, 24-32 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0026], [0028]; table 3 *;
 [A]WO2011134809  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [A] 9-10, 24-25 * ; page 2, lines 20-26 *;
 [A]US2004071685  (HOUSTON DEVIN [US], et al) [A] 9-10, 24-25 * ; paragraphs [0105]-[0106], [0109], [0112] *;
 [XY]  - "Daily Body Restore Probiotic Supplement with Digestive Enzymes", AMAZON, (20120807), pages 1 - 6, XP055568713 [X] 1 * , Ingredient Label Statement, side panel * [Y] 2-8, 26-30
 [Y]  - NASE, L et al., "Effect of Long-Term Consumption of a Probiotic Bacterium, Lactobacillus rhamnosus GG, in Milk on Dental Caries and Caries Risk in Children", Caries Research, (20010000), vol. 35, XP008127834 [Y] 11-18 * ; abstract; page 412 *
 [EX]  - ICHIM, TE et al., "Experimental support for the effects of a probiotic/digestive enzyme supplement on serum cholesterol concentrations and the intestinal microbiome", Journal of Translational Medicine, (20160622), vol. 14, no. 184, pages 1 - 9, XP055442072 [EX] 1-32

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12967-016-0945-2