Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465521

EP3465521 - FIRMWARE MODULE ENCRYPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NELSON, Marvin D
11311 Chinden Blvd.
Boise, Idaho 83714 / US
02 / MESA, Honee L
11311 Chinden Blvd.
Boise, Idaho 83714 / US
03 / JERAN, Paul
11311 Chinden Blvd.
Boise, Idaho 83714 / US
04 / GUNNING, Chris R
11311 Chinden Blvd.
Boise, Idaho 83714 / US
05 / NESS, Erik D
Columbia Tech Center
1115 SE 164th Ave.
Columbia Center
Suite 210
Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date16903344.627.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016US34631
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204822
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465521
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/57, G06F21/60
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FIRMWARE-MODULVERSCHLÜSSELUNG[2019/15]
English:FIRMWARE MODULE ENCRYPTION[2019/15]
French:CHIFFREMENT DE MODULE DE MICROLOGICIEL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2018National basic fee paid 
07.08.2018Search fee paid 
07.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007088613  (CHRISTOPHER A. ADKINS et al.) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0006], [0017], [0020], [0039], [0044]-[0046], [0050], [0071]; and figure 1. *
 [Y]US2014169803  (IKE SEUNG HO LEE) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0010], [0028]-[0029], [0033]; and figures 1-3. *
 [A]US2004034785  (HORNG-MING TAI et al.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0008], [0046]; and figure 1. *
 [A]US2010174913  (SIMON B. JOHNSON et al.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0013], [0027]; and figure 1. *
 [A]EP1892641  (STMICROELECTRONICS, INC) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0003], [0021]; and figure 1. *