Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465410

EP3465410 - ENCRYPTED DOCUMENT PRINTING UTILIZING MULTIPLE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 29.01.2020  [2020/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALI, Vali
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
02 / MOHRMAN, Christopher C.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
03 / MOHR, Adilson A.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
04 / PINHEIRO, Endrigo N.
Av. Ipiranga 6681
Predios 5-6
Predio 95 -5
6 e 7 andares
90619-900 Porto Alegre - Rio Grande do Sul / BR
05 / RIFFEL, Fabio
Av. Ipiranga 6681
Predios 5-6
Predio 95 -5
6 e 7 andares
90619-900 Porto Alegre - Rio Grande do Sul / BR
06 / FERREIRA, Ronaldo Rod
Av. Ipiranga 6681
Predios 5-6
Predio 95 -5
6 e 7 andares
90619-900 Porto Alegre - Rio Grande do Sul / BR
07 / PIRES, Jose Paulo
Av. Ipiranga 6681
Predios 5-6
Predio 95 -5
6 e 7 andares
90619-900 Porto Alegre - Rio Grande do Sul / BR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date16903349.527.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016US34665
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204827
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465410
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12, H04W4/00, H04L29/08, H04L29/06
[2020/05]
Former International [2019/15]G06F3/12, H04W4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DRUCKEN VON VERSCHLÜSSELTEN DOKUMENTEN MIT MEHREREN NETZWERKEN[2019/15]
English:ENCRYPTED DOCUMENT PRINTING UTILIZING MULTIPLE NETWORKS[2019/15]
French:IMPRESSION D'UN DOCUMENT CHIFFRÉ UTILISANT PLUSIEURS RÉSEAUX[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2018National basic fee paid 
16.10.2018Search fee paid 
16.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]US2016127581  (SUZUKI RYOUSUKE [JP]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013048509  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014189351  (STEELY FORREST [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP2743823  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003011810  (STROBEL KEVIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008320296  (WALKER JEFFREY W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012317409  (REVEL DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2014094117  (RAJENDRAN PREMKUMAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0004], [0024], [0028], [0032], [0035], [0038], [0043], [0060]; and figures 1-2, 5. *;
 [Y]US2008320296  (WALKER JEFFREY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0123], [0136], [0144]-[0145]; and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2013081121  (GREEN BRETT A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0012], [0040]; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2014189351  (STEELY FORREST [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0010], [0045]; and figure 1. *;
 [A]EP1855177  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0004], [0011]; and figure 6B. *