Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465071

EP3465071 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FORMING AND OPERATING AN ECOSYSTEM FOR A CONDUCTED ELECTRICAL WEAPON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Axon Enterprise, Inc.
17800 North 85th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DIMINO, Joseph Charles Jr.
c/o Taser International, Inc.
17800 North 85th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US
02 / HEROOR, Siddharth
c/o Taser International, Inc.
17800 North 85th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US
03 / GISH, Michael E.
c/o Taser International, Inc.
17800 North 85th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US
04 / GAGNON, Reinhard J.
c/o Taser International, Inc.
17800 North 85th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US
05 / MICHAELS, Teri Dawn
c/o Taser International, Inc.
17800 North 85th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16903362.815.12.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016US66810
Priority number, dateUS201662340192P23.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340192 P
US201662367040P26.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662367040 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204857
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465071
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:F41H13/00, F41B15/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG UND BEDIENUNG EINES ÖKOSYSTEMS FÜR EINE GEFÜHRTE ELEKTRISCHE WAFFE[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FORMING AND OPERATING AN ECOSYSTEM FOR A CONDUCTED ELECTRICAL WEAPON[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION ET DE COMMANDE D'UN ÉCOSYSTÈME POUR UNE ARME À IMPULSION ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2018National basic fee paid 
23.11.2018Search fee paid 
23.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
23.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
16.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US8594485  (BRUNDULA, STEVEN N.D.) [A] 1-13 * See column 5, lines 7-60; column 9, lines 1-52; column 10, lines 47-60 and figures 1-5. *
 [A]US8818829  (DELIA et al.) [A] 1-13 * See column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 53, claim 1 and figure 2. *
 [A]US2010198858  (EDWARDS et al.) [A] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0078], [0087] and figure 28. *
 [A]US8351297  (LAUDER et al.) [A] 1-13 * See column 8, lines 42-55 and figure 5B. *
 [A]US2007079538  (SMITH et al.) [A] 1-13 * See abstract, claim 1 and figure 1. *