Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466631

EP3466631 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KURODA, Shinichi
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei
Pfarrstraße 14
80538 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16904082.103.06.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016JP66662
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208458
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466631
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:B29B15/12, // B29C70/46, B29C70/16, B29B11/16, B32B37/12
[2019/26]
Former International [2019/15]B29B15/08, B29C39/10, B29C70/16, B32B37/12, C08J5/04, B29K101/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBUNDMATERIAL[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING COMPOSITE MATERIAL[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018Translation filed 
20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
03.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1749631  (AMERICAN GFM CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [E]EP3348371  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1-14 * figure 1 *;
 [E]EP3348378  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1-14 * figure 1 *
International search[A]WO2015146668  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; particularly, claims; paragraphs [0038] to [0050]; fig. 1 to 9 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007276453  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-14 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2006256202  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-14 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007126793  (TOHO TENAX CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2015079917  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , entire text & JP 5954441 B & CN 105745258 A *
by applicantJP2011168009