Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470166

EP3470166 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUTTING SAPPHIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Han's Laser Technology Industry Group Co., Ltd.
9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YUAN, Xuerui
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Xiaojun
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / DIAO, Lingtian
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / PENG, Yuguo
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
05 / LU, Jiangang
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
06 / LIU, Xiao
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
07 / MA, Guodong
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
08 / TANG, Jiangang
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
09 / YIN, Jiangang
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
10 / GAO, Yunfeng
NO. 9988 Shennan Avenue
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904352.808.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016CN85306
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210899
Date:14.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470166
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/53, B23K26/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON SAPHIR[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUTTING SAPPHIRE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCOUPE DE SAPHIR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2018Translation filed 
08.08.2018National basic fee paid 
08.08.2018Search fee paid 
08.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
12.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]CN105209218  (CORNING LASER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH) [Y] 1-17 * , description, paragraphs 0011-0112, and figures 1-9 *;
 [Y]CN101505908  (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 1-17 * , description, page 5, line 2 to page 10, line 5 *;
 [Y]CN102773612  (JIANGYIN DELI LASER EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1-17 * , description, paragraphs 0011-0018, and figure 1 *;
 [Y]CN1758986  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * , description, page 1, line 20 to page 22, bottom line, and figures 1-10 *;
 [A]CN102233479  (QMC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-17 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2013183837  (ARAI ALAN Y [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * , the whole document *;
 [A]JP2014079794  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-17 * , the whole document *;
 [A]JP5213112B  (DISC DISCO KK) [A] 1-17 * , the whole document *