Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471189

EP3471189 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAMURA, Fumihiro
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / NISHIJIMA, Manabu
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / MUROYA, Yuji
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / NITTA, Yoshiaki
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904628.108.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016JP67135
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212593
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471189
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/133, H01M4/131, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M10/052, H01M10/0585, // H01M4/02, H01M10/42
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/16]H01M10/05, H01M4/13, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M10/052, H01M10/0585
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT[2019/16]
English:NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY[2019/16]
French:BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018Translation filed 
06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Search fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012141871  (INAGAKI HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract; paragraphs [0056] - [0062]; tables 1, 4 *;
 [XI]JPH10214617  (FUJI FILM SELLTEC KK, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract; paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0 33] - [0037] - [0 41] , [0 43] , [0 57] * [I] 4;
 [XI]US2008166637  (INAGAKI HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0060] - [0087] - [ 210]; tables 1,3,4 * [I] 4
International search[A]JP2015167065  (SHARP KK) [A] 1-3, 5 * , entire text & WO 2014/010526 A1 *;
 [A]JP2015220119  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-5 * , entire text & WO 2015/177617 A1 whole documents *;
 [A]JP5318303B  (Nireco Corp.) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016042460  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * , entire text & US 2016/0049637 A1 whole documents & KR 10-2016-0020648 A & CN 105374981 A *;
 [A]JPH10214617  (FUJI FILM SELLTEC KK, et al) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *