Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471171

EP3471171 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Envision AESC Japan Ltd.
10-1 Hironodai 2-chome
Zama-shi, Kanagawa 252-0012 / JP
[2019/43]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIJIMA, Manabu
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / KAWAMURA, Fumihiro
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / MUROYA, Yuji
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / NITTA, Yoshiaki
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904630.708.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016JP67137
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212595
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471171
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/14, H01M2/16, H01M4/131, H01M4/133, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, // H01M10/052, H01M10/42
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/16]H01M2/18, H01M10/058
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT[2019/16]
English:NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY[2019/16]
French:BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018Translation filed 
07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Search fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.04.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006204855  (SARUWATARI HIDESATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 68] - [0078]; figure 2 * [I] 4;
 [X]WO2016031493  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * see US2017162850 *;
 US2017162850  [ ] (MURAKAMI CHIKARA [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0092] - [0096] - [ 145] , [ 147] *;
 [A]JP2011162669  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 30] , [0 37] , [0 60] *;
 [A]US2012121965  (MAKINO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 70] *
International search[X]JP2015008124  (LECLANCHE SA) [X] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0004], [0009] & US 2014/0363738 A1 paragraphs [0006], [0011] & GB 2514821 A & EP 2814082 A1 & KR 10-2014-0143318 A *;
 [X]JP2014532979  (Toptec HNS Co., Ltd.) [X] 1-5 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0002], [0010] & US 2015/0221916 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0002], [0024] & WO 2014/065460 A1 & DE 112012004667 T5 & KR 10-1256968 B1 & CN 103931021 A *;
 [X]JP2013142101  (NOGATA TETSURO) [X] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0003], [0020] & US 2014/0361457 A1 paragraphs [0003], [0023] & WO 2013/105526 A1 & TW 201335252 A & CN 104066781 A & KR 10-2014-0118995 A *;
 [X]WO2016031493  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0009], [0011], [0121] & CN 105580160 A *