Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470755

EP3470755 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / OCHIAI, Yasutaka
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904641.409.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016JP67230
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212606
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470755
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:F25B49/02, F25B13/00
[2019/26]
Former International [2019/16]F25B49/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:REFRIGERATION CYCLE APPARATUS[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL À CYCLE FRIGORIFIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2018Translation filed 
26.11.2018National basic fee paid 
26.11.2018Search fee paid 
26.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2014238060  (TAMAKI SHOGO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0068] , [0086] , [0133] , [ 144] , [ 134]; figures 2,8,3; claim 2 * [I] 7-11;
 [X]US2014260388  (UMEDA NOBUHIRO [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0025] - [0051] *;
 [X]JP2011220624  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0023] - [0040] *;
 [X]WO2016071947  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP3023716  (HANGZHOU SANHUA RES INST CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0049] - [0052] *
International search[XYA]JP2016508590  (Mitsubishi Electric Corp.) [X] 1, 9, 11 * , claims; paragraphs [0073] to [0099]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 2014/0238060 A1 & WO 2014/132650 A1 & CN 105008827 A * [Y] 8, 10 [A] 2-7;
 [XYA]JP2002147818  (SHARP KK) [X] 1, 9, 11 * , claims; paragraphs [0048] to [0053]; fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 8, 10 [A] 2-7;
 [Y]JP2000006802  (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8 * , claims; page 3, right column, lines 33 to 38 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2008249234  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [Y] 10 * , claims; paragraphs [0044] to [0047]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010127568  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010065982  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010151397  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2009150724  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0071722 A1 & EP 2284060 A1 & CN 102056784 A *
by applicantJP2009018770