Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471258

EP3471258 - POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd.
3, Kandaneribei-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0022 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YAGIHARA, Shigetoshi
c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd.
3 Kanda Neribei-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0022 / JP
02 / TANABE, Keisuke
c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd.
3 Kanda Neribei-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0022 / JP
03 / ONUMA, Yusaku
c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd.
3 Kanda Neribei-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0022 / JP
04 / SUGIMOTO, Takuya
c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd.
3 Kanda Neribei-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0022 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904658.810.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016JP67305
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212624
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471258
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02M7/48
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:STROMWANDLER[2019/16]
English:POWER CONVERTER[2019/16]
French:CONVERTISSEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2018Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]JP2009027900  (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1, 2, 6 * , abstract; paragraphs [0007] to [0013]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * [A] 3-5;
 [XA]JP2009254093  (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 6 * , abstract; paragraphs [0011] to [0022]; fig. 1, 3 (Family: none) * [A] 3-5;
 [A]JP2013513119  (Robert Bosch GmbH) [A] 1-6 * , & WO 2011/069825 A1 & DE 102009047608 A1 & CN 102656473 A *