Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463254

EP3463254 - A LID FOR A DRINKING BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Herobility AB
Slottsgatan 27
722 11 Västerås / SE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BERGSTRÖM, Mikael
Strandvägen 9
SE-725 92 Västerås / SE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB (Gävle)
Box 1274
801 37 Gävle / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16904763.607.06.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016SE50542
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213559
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463254
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61J11/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DECKEL FÜR EINE TRINKFLASCHE[2019/15]
English:A LID FOR A DRINKING BOTTLE[2019/15]
French:COUVERCLE POUR UNE BOUTEILLE DE BOISSON[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2018National basic fee paid 
05.12.2018Search fee paid 
05.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2005082301  (VERBOVSZKY ESTHER A [US]) [A] 1-11 * ; abstract; paragraph [0021]; figures; claims *;
 [A]DE102011007944  (BERNHARD STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * ; whole document; abstract; figures *;
 [A]US5653732  (SHEEHY CANDICE L [US]) [A] 1-11 * ; abstract; figures; claims *;
 [PX]US2016279032  (DAVIS BENJAMIN MARTIN [US], et al) [PX] 1-11 * ; abstract; figure 5; claims *;
 [A]US2004220618  (ROHRIG PETER [AT]) [A] 1-11 * ; abstract; figures; claims *