Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469409

EP3469409 - ANGULAR SUBPIXEL RENDERING MULTIVIEW DISPLAY USING SHIFTED MULTIBEAM ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEIA Inc.
2440 Sand Hill Road, Suite 303
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / FATTAL, David A.
Leia Inc.
2440 Sand Hill Rd. Ste. 303
Menlo Park California 94025 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904822.006.09.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US50451
Priority number, dateWO2016US3649508.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/US2016/036495
WO2016US4058430.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/US2016/040584
US201662214970P05.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662214970 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213676
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469409
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/12, F21V8/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ECKIGE SUBPIXELDARSTELLENDE MEHRFACHANSICHTSANZEIGE MIT VERSCHOBENEN MEHRSTRAHLELEMENTEN[2019/16]
English:ANGULAR SUBPIXEL RENDERING MULTIVIEW DISPLAY USING SHIFTED MULTIBEAM ELEMENTS[2019/16]
French:AFFICHAGE MULTIVUE DE RENDU ANGULAIRE SOUS-PIXEL UTILISANT DES ÉLÉMENTS MULTIFAISCEAUX DÉCALÉS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2018National basic fee paid 
05.04.2018Search fee paid 
05.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.04.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2015016844  (LEIA INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0033], [0053]-[0056], claims 1, 8 and figures 2B-2C, 4. *;
 [Y]US2008150936  (KARMAN GERARDUS P [NL]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0010], [0015] and figures 1-2. *;
 [Y]US2002141056  (KOBAYASHI TETSURO [JP], et al) [Y] 6-7 * See paragraphs [0044]-[0045], [0050] and figures 2(a), 3(a)-3(b). *;
 [A]US2013169694  (CHEN FU-HAO [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1-4, 7 and figures 1A-1C. *;
 [A]US2003058209  (BALOGH TIBOR [HU]) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1, 5 and figures 1-2. *