Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468617

EP3468617 - NON-INTEGRATING VIRAL DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
American Gene Technologies International Inc.
9640 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PAUZA, Charles, David
15010 Broshart Rd., 110
Rockville, MA 20850 / US
02 / LAHUSEN, Tyler
15010 Broshart Rd., 110
Rockville, MA 20850 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904834.512.12.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US66185
Priority number, dateUS201662347552P08.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347552 P
US201662431760P08.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662431760 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213697
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468617
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00, C12N15/49, C12N15/867
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR NICHTINTEGRALEN VIRALEN AUSGABE UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG DAMIT[2019/16]
English:NON-INTEGRATING VIRAL DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHODS RELATED THERETO[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION VIRAL SANS INTÉGRATION ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS À CE DERNIER[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2003013196  (ENGELMAN ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 17-20, 24-26 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0025], [0026], [0042], [0063], [0066], [0086]-[0089], [0139]; claim 5 * [Y] 3-6, 8, 10-16, 21-23, 27-32, 34-35;
 [Y]WO2005033282  (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC [US], et al) [Y] 3-6, 8, 10-16, 27-31 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0024], [0055], [0067], [0069], [0079] *;
 [Y]US2010119511  (WANG XINZHONG [US], et al) [Y] 21 * ; abstract *;
 [Y]US2004161412  (PENN MARC S [US], et al) [Y] 22 * ; abstract; paragraph [0082] *;
 [Y]US2015176006  (KRAUSE KARL-HEINZ [CH], et al) [Y] 23 * ; paragraph [0097] *;
 [Y]US2014248277  (HOFFMAN REBECCA S [US], et al) [Y] 29-31 * ; paragraphs [0051], [0082], [0160], [0364] *;
 [Y]US2010017911  (DAWSON WILLIAM O [US], et al) [Y] 32, 34-35 * ; paragraph [0017] *;
 [Y]US6156514  (ACEVEDO JORGE L [US], et al) [Y] 31 * ; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2006183230  (SILLA TOOMAS [EE], et al) [A] 36 * ; paragraphs [0022], [0052], [0057] *
 [Y]  - "Human papillomavirus type 16 (HPV16), complete genome", GenBank, (19940318), Database accession no. K02718.1, XP055455686 [Y] 8, 32 * ; pp 1-4; pages 3-4. *
 [Y]  - NUCLEOTIDE, Database accession no. S60559, XP055455689 [Y] 10-11, 34-35 * ; pp 1. *