Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469444

EP3469444 - SELF-REGULATING OPEN CIRCUIT PUMP UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - inventorpublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S. A. Armstrong Limited
23 Bertrand Avenue
Scarborough, Ontario M1L 2P3 / CA
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / THOMSEN, Peter
23 Bertrand Avenue
Scarborough, Ontario M1L 2P3 / CA
[2019/41]
Former [2019/16]01 / THOMSEN, Peter
23 Bertrand Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1L 2P3 / CA
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16904857.625.11.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016CA51392
Priority number, dateUS201662350038P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350038 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214701
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469444
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05D13/62, A62C37/00, F04D15/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SELBSTREGULIERENDE PUMPENEINHEIT MIT OFFENEM KREISLAUF[2019/16]
English:SELF-REGULATING OPEN CIRCUIT PUMP UNIT[2019/16]
French:UNITÉ DE POMPE À CIRCUIT OUVERT AUTORÉGULATEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2018National basic fee paid 
25.08.2018Search fee paid 
25.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2014005841  (CHENG ANDREW A [US], et al) [A] 1-56 ** See whole document **