blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469444 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469444



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 181
27.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
13.08.2018 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
27.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.07.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
27.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
27.07.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 21
27.07.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 21
27.07.2018 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
27.07.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
27.07.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 46