blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3469444 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680082381 EP16904857



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019234409Global Dossier 01.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201616063601 25.11.2016
US201662350038 14.06.2016
WO2016CA51392 25.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108700899Global Dossier 23.10.2018A
Priority number Date
US201662350038 14.06.2016
WO2016CA51392 25.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2993685Global Dossier 19.06.2018C
CA2993685 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662350038 14.06.2016
WO2016CA51392 25.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3469444Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662350038 14.06.2016
WO2016CA51392 25.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112018013003 04.12.2018A2
Priority number Date
US201662350038 14.06.2016
WO2016CA51392 25.11.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201805227S 30.07.2018A
Priority number Date
US201662350038 14.06.2016
WO2016CA51392 25.11.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017214701Global Dossier 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662350038 14.06.2016