Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471404

EP3471404 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Yongliang
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Petit, Maxime , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16905251.118.09.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016CN99241
Priority number, dateCN20161041409213.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610414092
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215139
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471404
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/74, H04N9/31, H02J7/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:ELECTRONIC APPARATUS[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018Translation filed 
20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]CN203193782U  (WANG LI) [A] 1-8 * description, paragraphs [0003]-[0040], and figures 1-4 *;
 [A]CN204539366U  (JUXIN ZHUHAI SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN203607899U  (LIU LEI) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN103179367  (LENOVO BEIJING LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN102624044  (INTERSIL INC) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101414753  (INVENTEC NANJING TECHNOLOGY CO [CN]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *