Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474647

EP3474647 - COOLING SYSTEM OF WORKING MEDIUM CONTACT TYPE FOR HIGH-POWER DEVICE, AND WORKING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guangdong Hi-1 New Materials Technology Research Institute Co. Ltd
Room 431, No. 333, Jiufo Construction Rd.
Zhongxin Guangzhou
Knowledge City
Guangzhou, Guangdong 510635 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Wei
Room 431, 333, Jiufo Construction Rd.
Zhongxin Guangzhou Knowledge City
Guangzhou Guangdong 510635 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Meyer, Thorsten
Meyer Patentanwaltskanzlei
Pfarrer-Schultes-Weg 14
89077 Ulm / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16905280.020.10.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016CN102650
Priority number, dateCN20161043936016.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610439360
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215168
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474647
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, H01L23/367
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KÜHLSYSTEM MIT ARBEITSMITTELKONTAKT FÜR EINE HOCHLEISTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/17]
English:COOLING SYSTEM OF WORKING MEDIUM CONTACT TYPE FOR HIGH-POWER DEVICE, AND WORKING METHOD THEREOF[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DU TYPE À CONTACT DE FLUIDE MOTEUR POUR DISPOSITIF HAUTE PUISSANCE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2018Translation filed 
24.12.2018National basic fee paid 
24.12.2018Search fee paid 
24.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
24.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]CN105658037  (SUZHOU DAJING ENERGY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * page 6 - page 7; figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5943211  (HAVEY MORT L [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *