Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471408

EP3471408 - INTER-VEHICLE DISTANCE ESTIMATION METHOD AND INTER-VEHICLE DISTANCE ESTIMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NODA, Kuniaki
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / FANG, Fang
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16905411.114.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016JP67609
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216856
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471408
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/18, G08G1/00, G08G1/01
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KALKULATION DES ABSTANDES ZWISCHEN FAHRZEUGEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KALKULATION DES ABSTANDES ZWISCHEN FAHRZEUGEN[2019/16]
English:INTER-VEHICLE DISTANCE ESTIMATION METHOD AND INTER-VEHICLE DISTANCE ESTIMATION DEVICE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE DISTANCE ENTRE VÉHICULES, ET DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION DE DISTANCE ENTRE VÉHICULES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005069248  (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * page 1, lines 1-14 * * page 2, lines 11-23 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 18 * * claims 1,8 *;
 [A]EP2084689  (AITEK S P A [IT]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 2-6 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0011] - [0030] * * claim 1 *;
 [A]JP2000222669  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-3,4,8,9 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0041] *;
 [A]US8497783  (LEOPOLD ALEXANDER [AT], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 42 *;
 [A]JP2005284678  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-3,6,13-20 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0061] *;
 [A]JP2012192878  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * * figures 2,6-7 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0028] *;
 [A]JP2000207677  (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0013] - [0033] *
International search[A]JP2014203349  (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0019]; fig. 2 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010072836  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0021]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007334631  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0059] to [0061]; fig. 3, 4 & US 2008/0002857 A1 paragraphs [0073] to [0076]; fig. 3 to 4 & CN 101090485 A *;
 [A]JP2012191354  (CANON KK) [A] 1-5 * , paragraph [0013]; fig. 4 (Family: none) *