Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473386

EP3473386 - CONTROLLER FOR END PORTION CONTROL OF MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM ROBOT, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM ROBOT BY USING CONTROLLER, AND ROBOT OPERATED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neuromeka
406 4F 37 Seongsui-ro 22-gil
Seongdong-gu, Seoul 04798 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Jong Hoon
601-1104 7 Migeum-ro 189beon-gil
Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12250 / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Botti, Mario
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16905594.431.10.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016KR12401
Priority number, dateKR2016007606317.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160076063
KR2016014221428.10.2016         Original published format: KR 20160142214
[2019/17]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217610
Date:21.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473386
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:STEUERGERÄT ZUR ENDTEILSTEUERUNG EINES ROBOTERS MIT MEHREREN FREIHEITSGRADEN, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES ROBOTERS MIT MEHREREN FREIHEITSGRADEN ANHAND DER STEUERUNG UND DAMIT BETRIEBENER ROBOTER[2019/17]
English:CONTROLLER FOR END PORTION CONTROL OF MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM ROBOT, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM ROBOT BY USING CONTROLLER, AND ROBOT OPERATED THEREBY[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE SERVANT À LA COMMANDE DE PARTIE TERMINALE D'UN ROBOT À PLUSIEURS DEGRÉS DE LIBERTÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN ROBOT À PLUSIEURS DEGRÉS DE LIBERTÉ À L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, ET ROBOT ACTIONNÉ PAR UN TEL DISPOSITIF[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018Translation filed 
18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]US2008255704  (BRAUT KNUT [NO]) [X] 1, 11-12, 14-15 ,19-20 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0048], [0060] and figures 1 -4. * [Y] 2-8, 13, 16-18 [A] 9-10;
 [Y]JP2004223663  (DOSHISHA) [Y] 2, 5-6, 16-18 * See paragraphs [0018], [0033], [0060] and figures 1-2. *;
 [Y]KR20150129172  (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3-8 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0027], [0033] and figures 1-3. *;
 [Y]KR20150106927  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [Y] 13 * See paragraph [0048] and figure 3. *;
 [A]KR20140148471  (REIS GROUP HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0090] and figures 1-10. *