Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469547

EP3469547 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICES, METHODS FOR CONTROLLING AN IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Razer (Asia-Pacific) Pte Ltd.
514 Chai Chee Lane
No. 07-05
Singapore 469029 / SG
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SHARMA, Ayush
c/o Razer (Asia-Pacific) Pte. Ltd.
514 Chai Chee Lane 07-05
Singapore 469029 / SG
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16905619.914.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016SG50271
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217924
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469547
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06T3/00, G06F3/14, H04N5/445
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/16]G06T3/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN[2019/16]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICES, METHODS FOR CONTROLLING AN IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIA[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Search fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
06.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2015253974  (YOUNG DAVID ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-15 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0054] * [I] 2,3,7;
 [A]US2014051510  (BENKO HRVOJE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012223885  (PEREZ GRITSKO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010201878  (BARENBRUG BART GERARD BERNARD [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010039561  (KWISTHOUT CORNELIS WILHELMUS [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[XY]US2011128294  (MANABE YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-2, 6-8, 10-11 , 13-19, 21-24, 26-28 * See paragraphs [0013], [0026], [0029]-[0030], [0041], [0043], [0066]; and figures 1-2, 7-8. * [Y] 3-5, 9, 12, 20, 25;
 [Y]US2014146080  (IVASHIN VICTOR [US], et al) [Y] 3-5, 9, 12, 20, 25 * See paragraphs [0041], [0045]; claim 19; and figure 7. *;
 [A]WO2013159028  (SCALABLE DISPLAY TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0038]; and figure 5. *;
 [A]US2012206343  (PLUT WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0051]; and figure 4. *;
 [A]US2006215765  (HWANG CHERNG-DAW [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * See paragraph [0063]; and figure 10. *