Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471819

EP3471819 - LEAD AND CONDUIT PLACEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Datta, Subhajit
3124 Bean Oller Road
Delaware, OH 43015 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16905653.816.06.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016US37864
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217996
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471819
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRODE UND LEITUNGSPLATZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[2019/17]
English:LEAD AND CONDUIT PLACEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE DE PLACEMENT DE CONDUCTEURS ET DE CONDUITS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2007239246  (CAMPS ANTOINE N J [NL], et al) [A] 1-4, 6, 11-15, 19-27, 42 * fig 5, 6A, para [0034]-[0035], [0042] *;
 [A]US2004088035  (W GUENST GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6, 11-15, 19-27, 42 * fig 1, 2, para [0039]-[0040] *;
 [XE]US9370655  (DATTA SUBHAJIT [US]) [XE] 1-4, 6, 11-15, 19-27, 42 * entire document *;
 [A]US2005004644  (KELSCH DANIEL N [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6, 11-15, 19-27, 42 * entire document *;
 [A]US2007185502  (SMITS KAREL [NL]) [A] 1-4, 6, 11-15, 19-27, 42 * entire document *